Minnesota Department of Natural Resources et al v. White Earth Band of Ojibwe, The et al
Minnesota District Court | |
Judge: | Wilhelmina M Wright |
Referred: | Leo I Brisbois |
Case #: | 0:21-cv-01869 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 25:640 Indian Tribal Rights |
Case Filed: | Aug 19, 2021 |
Re-opened: | Aug 25, 2022 |
Terminated: | Feb 01, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Feb 15, 2022 4:35 AM CST |
Defendant
White Earth Band of Ojibwe, The
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Hon. David A. DeGroat
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randall Doneen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Minnesota Department of Natural Resources 55155
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Barb Naramore
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sarah Strommen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Unamed DNR Conservation Officers
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Wednesday, February 01, 2023 | ||
38 | 38
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Wed 02/01 12:51 PM
JUDGMENT(ACH) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
37 | 37
1
pgs
order
Order in Response to Letter/Request/E-mail Order Dismissing Case
Wed 02/01 12:05 PM
ORDER FOR DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 2/1/2023. (RJE) |
|
Tuesday, January 31, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Letter to District Judge
Tue 01/31 10:47 AM
LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Randall Doneen, Minnesota Department of Natural Resources, Barb Naramore, Sarah Strommen regarding joint request for dismissal without prejudice . (Larson, Oliver) |
|
Thursday, August 25, 2022 | ||
35 | 35
1
pgs
order
Order Reopening Case
Thu 08/25 4:44 PM
ORDER TO VACATE. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 8/24/2022.(MMG) |
|
Wednesday, August 10, 2022 | ||
34 | 34
appeal
USCA Mandate
Thu 08/11 5:29 PM
MANDATE of USCA (electronic copy) as to26 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit, filed by Randall Doneen, Barb Naramore, Sarah Strommen, Unamed DNR Conservation Officers, Minnesota Department of Natural Resources. (MMG) |
|
33 | 33
appeal
USCA Judgment
Thu 08/11 5:10 PM
USCA JUDGMENT (electronic copy) as to26 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit, filed by Randall Doneen, Barb Naramore, Sarah Strommen, Unamed DNR Conservation Officers, Minnesota Department of Natural Resources. Pursuant to the Stipulation for Dismissal of the parties, the appeal is dismissed as moot and remanded to the district court with instructions to vacate the September 13, 2021 judgment. Mandate shall issue forthwith. (MMG) |
|
Thursday, October 07, 2021 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Transcript
Thu 10/07 11:42 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Motions Hearing held on 9/1/2021 before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. (41 pages). Court Reporter: Lori Simpson. For a copy of the transcript, please file a Transcript Request under Other Filings/Other Documents . Parties have 7 days to file a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction. In accordance with Judicial Conference policy and Local Rule 80.1, the transcript may be released and made remotely electronically available to the public in 90 days. For further information on redaction procedures, please review [LINK:Local Rule 5.5] and Case Information >Transcripts, Court Reporters and Digital Audio Recordings . Notice Intent/No Intent to Request Redactions due 10/14/2021. Redaction Request due 10/28/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 11/8/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 1/5/2022. (LAS) |
|
Wednesday, September 22, 2021 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Transcript Request
Wed 09/22 5:07 PM
TRANSCRIPT REQUEST for an Expedited 14-Day Transcript of19 Motion Hearing, to Court Reporter Lori Simpson. (Larson, Oliver) |
|
30 | 30
respm
Exhibit (Motions and Related Filings)
Wed 09/22 4:17 PM
EXHIBIT Refiling White Earth Exhibits related to Response Brief and link back to Doc 5 re5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by David A. DeGroat, White Earth Band of Ojibwe, The.(Bibeau, Frank) |
|
Monday, September 13, 2021 | ||
29 | 29
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 09/13 4:03 PM
USCA Case Number 21-3050 for26 Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit, filed by Randall Doneen, Barb Naramore, Sarah Strommen, Unamed DNR Conservation Officers, Minnesota Department of Natural Resources. (MMG) |
|
28 | 28
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Mon 09/13 11:41 AM
TRANSMITTAL OF APPEAL LETTER TO U. S. COURT OF APPEALS, 8TH CIRCUIT, Re: Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit,26 . (MMP) |
|
27 | 27
order
Judgment (Clerk's Office Only)
Mon 09/13 10:27 AM
JUDGMENT(MMP) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Notice - appeal | ||
Friday, September 10, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
appeal
Notice of Appeal to 8th Circuit
Fri 09/10 2:13 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO 8TH CIRCUIT as to25 Order in Response to Letter/Request/E-mail,20 Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, by Randall Doneen, Minnesota Department of Natural Resources, Barb Naramore, Sarah Strommen, Unamed DNR Conservation Officers. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number AMNDC-9013371. (O'Donovan, Colin) |
|
25 | 25
3
pgs
order
Order in Response to Letter/Request/E-mail
Fri 09/10 10:21 AM
ORDER. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' request for permission to file a motion to reconsider21 is DENIED. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 9/10/2021. (RJE) |
|
Thursday, September 09, 2021 | ||
24 | 24
misc
Letter to District Judge
Thu 09/09 10:21 AM
LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Randall Doneen, Minnesota Department of Natural Resources, Barb Naramore, Sarah Strommen, Unamed DNR Conservation Officers enclosing Tribal Court scheduling order . (Larson, Oliver) |
|
Wednesday, September 08, 2021 | ||
23 | 23
misc
Letter Response to Letter
Wed 09/08 9:08 AM
LETTER RESPONSE re21 Letter to Request Permission to File Motion to Reconsider. (Plumer, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, September 07, 2021 | ||
22 | 22
order
Order for Party to File Document/Respond to Court
Tue 09/07 10:15 AM
TEXT-ONLY ORDER: Defendants may file a letter response to Plaintiffs' Letter to Request Permission to Reconsider21 no later than September 8, 2021, at 12:00 p.m. Ordered by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 9/7/2021. (RJE) |
|
Sunday, September 05, 2021 | ||
21 | 21
2
pgs
misc
Letter to Request Permission to File Motion to Reconsider
Sun 09/05 12:09 PM
LETTER to Request Permission to File Motion to Reconsider dismissal without prejudice . (Larson, Oliver) |
|
Friday, September 03, 2021 | ||
20 | 20
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction
Fri 09/03 3:43 PM
IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiffs' motion for a preliminary injunction5 is DENIED and Plaintiffs' complaint1 is DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. (Written Opinion) Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 9/3/2021. (MKO) |
|
Wednesday, September 01, 2021 | ||
19 | 19
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 09/02 3:55 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright: Motion Hearing held on 9/1/2021 re5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Randall Doneen, Barb Naramore, Sarah Strommen, Unamed DNR Conservation Officers, Minnesota Department of Natural Resources. (Court Reporter Lori Simpson) (RJE) |
|
18 | 18
misc
Letter to District Judge
Wed 09/01 12:29 PM
LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Randall Doneen, Minnesota Department of Natural Resources, Barb Naramore, Sarah Strommen, Unamed DNR Conservation Officers enclosing treaties as exhibits .(Larson, Oliver) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Treaties with the Chippewa | ||
Monday, August 30, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 08/30 3:47 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Colin Patrick O'Donovan on behalf of All Plaintiffs. (O'Donovan, Colin) |
|
16 | 16
misc
Letter to District Judge
Mon 08/30 12:59 PM
LETTER TO DISTRICT JUDGE by Minnesota Department of Natural Resources .(Larson, Oliver) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Tribal Court - Modified Order on Motion to Dismiss (8-30-21) | ||
Friday, August 27, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/27 8:26 PM
Defendants' Response to Motion for Preliminary Injunction ANSWER to Complaint Petitioners' Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by David A. DeGroat, White Earth Band of Ojibwe, The. (Bibeau, Frank) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Response to Motion for Stay, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Plaintiff's Request for TRO, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Ex 1 for Request for TRO, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Ex 2 for Request for TRO, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) Ex 3 for Request for TRO, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) Ex 4 for Request for TRO, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) Manoomin Complaint with Exhibits, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) Tribal Judge DeGroat Order for Recusal | ||
Thursday, August 26, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
service
Summons Returned Executed
Thu 08/26 3:10 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Minnesota Department of Natural Resources, Unamed DNR Conservation Officers, Barb Naramore, Randall Doneen, Sarah Strommen. David A. DeGroat served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021; White Earth Band of Ojibwe, The served on 8/26/2021, answer due 9/16/2021. (Larson, Oliver) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Affidavit (Initial Pleadings and Other Non-Motion Filings)
Thu 08/26 2:44 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Adam Kumpula, Deputy Sheriff re11 Briefing Order,3 Summons Issued,1 Complaint,10 Notice of Hearing on Motion (PROOF OF SERVICE) byRandall Doneen, Minnesota Department of Natural Resources, Barb Naramore, Sarah Strommen, Unamed DNR Conservation Officers. (Larson, Oliver) |
|
Tuesday, August 24, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
order
Briefing Order
Tue 08/24 6:22 PM
BRIEFING SCHEDULE ON PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION. (See order for details). The Motion Hearing is set for 9/1/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 7A (STP) before Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright. Signed by Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright on 8/24/2021. (RJE) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Tue 08/24 4:52 PM
NOTICE OF HEARING ON MOTION5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested : Date and time to be determined. (Larson, Oliver) |
|
9 | 9
respm
Proposed Order to Judge re Motion
Tue 08/24 4:50 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Randall Doneen, Minnesota Department of Natural Resources, Barb Naramore, Sarah Strommen, Unamed DNR Conservation Officers.(Larson, Oliver) |
|
8 | 8
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Tue 08/24 4:50 PM
Declaration of Oliver Larson in Support of5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Randall Doneen, Minnesota Department of Natural Resources, Barb Naramore, Sarah Strommen, Unamed DNR Conservation Officers.(Larson, Oliver) |
|
7 | 7
respm
Declaration in Support of Motion
Tue 08/24 4:49 PM
Declaration of Randall Doneen in Support of5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Randall Doneen, Minnesota Department of Natural Resources, Barb Naramore, Sarah Strommen, Unamed DNR Conservation Officers.(Larson, Oliver) |
|
6 | 6
19
pgs
respm
Memorandum in Support of Motion
Tue 08/24 4:48 PM
MEMORANDUM in Support re5 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Randall Doneen, Minnesota Department of Natural Resources, Barb Naramore, Sarah Strommen, Unamed DNR Conservation Officers.(Larson, Oliver) |
|
Att: 1 LR7.1/LR72.2 Word Count Compliance Certificate Rule 7.1 | ||
5 | 5
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Tue 08/24 4:46 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction - Expedited Handling Requested filed by Randall Doneen, Minnesota Department of Natural Resources, Barb Naramore, Sarah Strommen, Unamed DNR Conservation Officers. (Larson, Oliver) |
|
Thursday, August 19, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
notice
Notice - Judge Practice Pointers
Thu 08/19 1:37 PM
(Text-Only) NOTICE - Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright's Practice Pointers are available on the United States District Court for the District of Minnesota's[LINK:website] . All parties are expected to be familiar with and adhere to these Practice Pointers, including Judge Wright's deviations from the Local Rules with respect to motion scheduling and briefing deadlines. (RJE) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 08/19 10:54 AM
Summons Issued as to David A. DeGroat, White Earth Band of Ojibwe, The. (MMG) |
|
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Initial Case Assignment
Thu 08/19 10:53 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Wilhelmina M. Wright per 6th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Leo I. Brisbois. Please use case number 21-cv-1869 WMW/LIB. (MMG) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 08/19 10:04 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants (filing fee $ 402, receipt number AMNDC-8961551) filed by DNR Section Manager Randall Doneen, Minnesota Department of Natural Resources, DNR Deputy Commissioner Barb Naramore, DNR Commissioner Sarah Strommen, Unnamed DNR Conservation Officers 1-10. Filer requests summons issued. (Larson, Oliver) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) B, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet |