Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Mary F Walrath
Case #: 1:21-bk-11190
Case Filed:Aug 30, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$50,000,001 to $100 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
BL Santa Fe, LLC
1297 Bishops Lodge Rd
Santa Fe, NM 87506-6900
Represented By
Joseph M Mulvihill
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Matthew Barry Lunn
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


1. Bishop's Lodge owner files Chapter 11 bankruptcy; resort keeps operating (santafenewmexican.com)
Submitted Wed 09/08/2021
Docket last updated: 17 minutes ago
Friday, October 22, 2021
166 166 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Fri 10/22 10:23 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Debtors Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of ValueScope, Inc. as Restructuring Advisor to the Debtors, Effective as of the Petition Date (Docket No. 161), Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order (A) Approving Adequacy of Disclosure Statement, and (B) Confirming Chapter 11 Plan of BL Santa Fe, LLC and BL Santa Fe (Mezz), LLC (Docket No. 162), Final Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors (A) to Obtain Postpetition Financing and (B) to Utilize Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (IV) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 163), Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearing Dates (Docket No. 164) . Filed by Stretto. Related [+] (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-] 161 ,162 ,163 ,164
165 165 misc Transcript Fri 10/22 9:34 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 10/19/2021 RE: Second Day. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 1/20/2022. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office. For information about how to obtain a transcript, call the Clerk's Office or Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, Reliable, at Telephone number 302-654-8080. Filed by . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 10/29/2021. Redaction Request Due By 11/12/2021. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/22/2021. Transcript access will be restricted through 1/20/2022. (LCN)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
164 164 court Omnibus Hearing Dates Thu 10/21 4:34 PM
Order Scheduling Omnibus Hearings. Related [+] Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 11/23/2021 at 11:30 AM US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Omnibus Hearings scheduled for 12/21/2021 at 11:30 AM US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Signed on 10/21/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 160
163 163 30+ pgs order Order Thu 10/21 4:33 PM
Order (FINAL) (I) Authorizing the Debtors (A) to Obtain Postpetition Financing and (B) to Utilize Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (IV) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Signed on 10/21/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 10 ,51 ,112 ,159
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
162 162 30+ pgs order Order Thu 10/21 4:31 PM
Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order (A) Approving Adequacy of Disclosure Statement, and (B) Confirming Chapter 11 Plan of BL Santa Fe, LLC and BL Santa Fe (Mezz), LLC Related [+] Signed on 10/21/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 12 ,13 ,69 ,140 ,158
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
161 161 motion Employ/Retain - Application/Motion Thu 10/21 1:55 PM
Application/Motion to Employ/Retain ValueScope, Inc. as Restructuring Advisor to the Debtors, Effective as of the Petition Date Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 11/23/2021 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 11/4/2021. (Mulvihill, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Exhibit C
160 160 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Thu 10/21 1:49 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Scheduling of Omnibus Hearing Dates Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. (Mulvihill, Joseph)
Related: [-]
159 159 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Thu 10/21 1:45 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Final Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors (A) to Obtain Postpetition Financing and (B) to Utilize Cash Collateral, (II) Granting Adequate Protection to Prepetition Secured Parties, (III) Modifying the Automatic Stay, and (IV) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. (Mulvihill, Joseph)
Related: [-] 10 ,51 ,64 ,112
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
158 158 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Wed 10/20 4:41 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Findings of Fact, Conclusions of Law and Order (A) Approving Adequacy of Disclosure Statement, and (B) Confirming Chapter 11 Plan of BL Santa Fe, LLC and BL Santa Fe (Mezz), LLC Related [+] Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. (Mulvihill, Joseph)
Related: [-] 12 ,13 ,140 ,141
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
157 157 court Minute Entry Wed 10/20 9:13 AM
MINUTE ENTRY Re: Related [+] APPEARANCES: See attached sign-in sheet MATTERS: 1) Order due under COC 2) Continued (lmc)
Related: [-] 147 Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on 10/19/21
156 156 notice Notice of Service Tue 10/19 4:57 PM
Notice of Service of Subpoena Issued to Bradley Curtis Brooks Related [+] Filed by HRV Hotel Partners, LLC, HRV Santa Fe, LLC, Richard F. Holland. (Horan, Thomas)
Related: [-] 132
155 155 misc Exhibit Tue 10/19 1:40 PM
Exhibit(s) // Notice of Filing of Amendment to Restructuring Support Agreement Related [+] Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. (Mulvihill, Joseph)
Related: [-] 12 ,13
154 154 notice Withdrawal - Notice Tue 10/19 1:37 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Notice of Filing of Amendment to Restructuring Support Agreement Related [+] Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. (Mulvihill, Joseph)
Related: [-] 153
153 153 misc Exhibit Tue 10/19 11:18 AM
Exhibit(s) // Notice of Filing of Amendment to Restructuring Support Agreement Related [+] Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. (Mulvihill, Joseph)
Related: [-] 12 ,13
Monday, October 18, 2021
152 152 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Mon 10/18 7:09 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing on October 19, 2021 at 11:30 A.M. (ET) (Docket No. 147) . Filed by Stretto. Related [+] (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-] 147
151 151 order Appear pro hac vice Mon 10/18 8:08 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Peter Roberts Related [+] Signed on 10/18/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 146
150 150 order Appear pro hac vice Mon 10/18 8:07 AM
Order Approving Motion for Admission pro hac vice of Brian Shaw Related [+] Signed on 10/18/2021. (LMC)
Related: [-] 145
Friday, October 15, 2021
149 149 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Fri 10/15 8:23 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Declaration of Dr. Scott D. Hakala in Support of Entry of Order (A) Approving Adequacy of Disclosure Statement, and (B) Confirming Chapter 11 Plan of BL Santa Fe, LLC and BL Santa Fe (Mezz), LLC (Docket No. 134), Declaration of David Mack in Support of Entry of Order (A) Approving Adequacy of Disclosure Statement, and (B) Confirming Chapter 11 Plan of BL Santa Fe, LLC and BL Santa Fe (Mezz), LLC (Docket No. 135), Declaration of Nunzio Desantis in Support of Entry of Order (A) Approving Adequacy of Disclosure Statement, and (B) Confirming Chapter 11 Plan of BL Santa Fe, LLC and BL Santa Fe (Mezz), LLC (Docket No. 136), Declaration of Keith Bierman in Connection with the Debtors Request for Entry of Order (A) Approving Adequacy of Disclosure Statement, and (B) Confirming Chapter 11 Plan of BL Santa Fe, LLC and BL Santa Fe (Mezz), LLC (Docket No. 137), Voting Declaration of Stretto Regarding Tabulation of Votes in Connection with the Chapter 11 Plan of BL Santa Fe, LLC and BL Santa Fe (Mezz), LLC (Docket No. 138), Debtors Memorandum of Law in Support of Entry of Order (A) Approving Adequacy of Disclosure Statement, and (B) Confirming Chapter 11 Plan of BL Santa Fe, LLC and BL Santa Fe (Mezz), LLC (Docket No. 139), Notice of Filing of (I) Revised Chapter 11 Plan of BL Santa Fe, LLC and BL Santa Fe (Mezz), LLC and (II) Blackline Thereof (Docket No. 140), Notice of Filing of Proposed Confirmation Order (Docket No. 141), Declaration of Jay Wolf of Juniper Investment Advisors, LLC and Juniper Capital Partners, LLC in Support of Confirmation of Debtors Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization of BL Santa Fe, LLC and BL Santa Fe (Mezz), LLC (Docket No. 142) . Filed by Stretto. Related [+] (Betance, Sheryl)
Related: [-] 134 ,135 ,136 ,137 ,138 ,139 ,140 ,141 ,142
148 148 motion Quash a Subpoena - Motion Fri 10/15 4:47 PM
Motion to Quash a Subpoena of Bradley Curtis Brooks Related [+] Filed by Bradley Curtis Brooks. (Mulvihill, Joseph)
Related: [-] 132
147 147 notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice Fri 10/15 12:03 PM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. Hearing scheduled for 10/19/2021 at 11:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 5th Fl., Courtroom #4, Wilmington, Delaware. (Mulvihill, Joseph)
Related: [-]
146 146 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Fri 10/15 11:22 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Peter Roberts, Esq. . Receipt Number 3721616, Filed by HRV Hotel Partners, LLC, HRV Santa Fe, LLC, Richard F. Holland. (Horan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
145 145 motion Pro Hac Vice Admission - Motion Fri 10/15 11:20 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Brian Shaw, Esq. . Receipt Number 3721616, Filed by HRV Hotel Partners, LLC, HRV Santa Fe, LLC, Richard F. Holland. (Horan, Thomas)
Related: [-]
144 144 misc Declaration Fri 10/15 10:44 AM
Declaration of Dr. Scott D. Hakala in Support of Entry of Order (A) Approving Adequacy of Disclosure Statement, and (B) Confirming Chapter 11 Plan of BL Santa Fe, LLC and BL Santa Fe (Mezz), LLC Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. (Mulvihill, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A - D
143 143 notice Withdrawal - Notice Fri 10/15 10:33 AM
Notice of Withdrawal of Declaration of Dr. Scott D. Hakala in Support of Entry of Order (A) Approving Adequacy of Disclosure Statement, and (B) Confirming Chapter 11 Plan of BL Santa Fe, LLC and BL Santa Fe (Mezz), LLC Related [+] Filed by BL Santa Fe, LLC. (Mulvihill, Joseph)
Related: [-] 134