APPS Broadcast Network Incorporated v. Thomas et al
Arizona District Court | |
Judge: | James A Teilborg |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-01717 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Jul 30, 2014 |
Terminated: | Feb 20, 2015 |
Last checked: Thursday May 14, 2015 4:06 AM MST |
Defendant
AGN Sports LLC
|
|
Defendant
Jeffrey P Rice
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Rice
|
|
Defendant
David A Thomas
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Thomas
|
|
Defendant
Leon Hicks Tolleson, III
|
|
Defendant
Unknown Tolleson
|
|
Plaintiff
APPS Broadcast Network Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Friday, February 20, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
order
Order Dismissing Case
Fri 02/20 3:55 PM
ORDER the11 Motion to Withdraw by all counsel for Plaintiff is granted. ORDERED this case is dismissed, without prejudice, because Plaintiff cannot appear in federal court without counsel. ORDERED that Plaintiff's former counsel shall send a copy of this Order to Plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 2/20/2015. (LFIG) |
|
Thursday, January 29, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
order
Order
Thu 01/29 3:53 PM
ORDER re:11 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney filed by APPS Broadcast Network Incorporated. Plaintiff is a corporation and a corporation cannot appear in federal court without counsel. ORDERED that by 2/17/2015, plaintiff must either find substitute counxsel or oppose current counsel's motioni to withdraw. FURTHER ORDERED that counsel shall send a copy of the attached Order to plaintiff. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 1/29/2015. (TLB) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Notice of Deficiency
Thu 01/29 1:33 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCY - Description of deficiency: Proposed order not e-mailed to chambers re: Plaintiff's Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. The deficiency must be corrected within 1 business day of this notice. (TLB) |
|
Tuesday, January 20, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 01/20 1:32 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by APPS Broadcast Network Incorporated.(Johnson, Eric) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Tuesday, September 16, 2014 | ||
Remark: as to out of state counsel Kent Maynard Jr. - removed for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS) | ||
Tuesday, August 19, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by APPS Broadcast Network Incorporated: Affidavit of Service re: Summons, Complaint, Civil Case Cover Sheet, Plaintiff's Corporate Disclosure Statement, Notice of Availability of U.S. Magistrate to Exercise Jurisdiction upon AGN Sports, LLC on July 31, 2014. (Johnson, Eric) | |
Friday, August 15, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 SERVICE EXECUTED filed by APPS Broadcast Network Incorporated: Rule 4 Waiver of Service of Summons. Waiver sent on 08/09/2014 to David Thomas & Leon Tolleson . (Johnson, Eric) | |
Thursday, August 07, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 NOTICE of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information filed by APPS Broadcast Network Incorporated. (Johnson, Eric) Modified on 8/8/2014 to reflect that AO form not needed, per counsel, no registered marks(SJF). | |
Friday, August 01, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 STANDARD TRACK ORDER. Signed by Senior Judge James A Teilborg on 8/1/2014. (TLB) | |
Wednesday, July 30, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms.Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information, found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading (REK) | |
5 | 5 Summons Issued as to AGN Sports LLC, Jeffrey P Rice, David A Thomas, Leon Hicks Tolleson, III.(REK). *** IMPORTANT: When printing the summons, select "Document and stamps" or "Document and comments" for the seal to appear on the document. | |
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
4 | 4 Filing fee paid, receipt number 0970-10718638. This case has been assigned to the Honorable James A. Teilborg. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 14-01717 PHX-JAT. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK) | |
3 | 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by APPS Broadcast Network Incorporated. (submitted by Eric Johnson) (REK) | |
2 | 2 SUMMONS Submitted by APPS Broadcast Network Incorporated. (submitted by Eric Johnson)(REK) | |
Att: 1 Summons, | ||
Att: 2 Summons, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $400.00, receipt number 0970-10718638 filed by APPS Broadcast Network Incorporated. (submitted by Eric Johnson)(REK) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet |