Anthony Marano Company v. Mayfair Market, Inc. et al
Illinois Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Ruben Castillo |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-05863 |
Nature of Suit | 891 Other Statutes - Agricultural Acts |
Cause | 07:499 Agricultural Commodities Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 31, 2014 |
Terminated: | Sep 03, 2014 |
Last checked: Friday May 15, 2015 1:35 AM CDT |
Claimant
La Galera Produce, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Claimant
Strube Celery & Vegetable Co.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Nicholas Dilles
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mayfair Market, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
John D Dernis
|
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
La Galera Produce, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor Plaintiff
Strube Celery & Vegetable Co.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anthony Marano Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/25/2015 5:28 PM CST |
Thursday, July 31, 2014 | ||
CASE ASSIGNED to the Honorable Ruben Castillo. Designated as Magistrate Judge the Honorable Jeffrey Cole. (lcw, ) | ||
SUMMONS Issued as to Defendants Nicholas Dilles, Mayfair Market, Inc. (pg, ) | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT filed by Anthony Marano Company; Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0752-9721723.(Marcus, Robert) | |
2 | 2 CIVIL Cover Sheet (Marcus, Robert) | |
3 | 3 ATTORNEY Appearance for Plaintiff Anthony Marano Company by Robert B Marcus (Marcus, Robert) | |
4 | 4 NOTIFICATION of Affiliates pursuant to Local Rule 3.2 by Anthony Marano Company (Marcus, Robert) | |
5 | 5 ATTORNEY Appearance for Claimants Strube Celery & Vegetable Co., La Galera Produce, LLC by Mary Jean Fassett (Fassett, Mary) | |
6 | 6 MOTION by Plaintiff Anthony Marano Company for temporary restraining order Motion for Temporary Restraining Order With Notice (Marcus, Robert) | |
7 | 7 MOTION by Plaintiff Anthony Marano Company for preliminary injunction Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Marcus, Robert) | |
8 | 8 6 pgs MEMORANDUM motion for preliminary injunction7 , motion for temporary restraining order6 by Anthony Marano Company Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraining Order With Notice and Motion for Preliminary Injunction (Marcus, Robert) | |
9 | 9 DECLARATION regarding motion for preliminary injunction7 , memorandum,8 , complaint1 , motion for temporary restraining order6 Declaration of Anton Marano in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Temporary Restraing Order, Motion for Preliminary Injunction, and PACA Trust Claim(Marcus, Robert) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit AMC's PACA License, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Mayfair's PACA License, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Statement of Account, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Invoices |