New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:David S Jones
Case #: 1:21-bk-11591
Case Filed:Sep 08, 2021

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$10,000,001 to $50 million
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
A.B.C. Carpet Co., Inc.
888 Broadway
New York, NY 10003-1280
Represented By
Oscar N. Pinkas
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014


1. ABC Carpet & Home Files for Chapter 11 Bankruptcy (therealdeal.com)
Submitted Thu 09/09/2021
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, October 22, 2021
191 191 misc Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 Fri 10/22 7:31 PM
Certificate of No Objection Pursuant to LR 9075-2 for the Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Stretto, As Administrative Advisor for the Debtors, Effective as of the Petition Date [ECF Nos. 158, 184] Related [+] Filed by Oscar N. Pinkas on behalf of A.B.C. Carpet Co., Inc.. (Pinkas, Oscar)
Related: [-] 158
190 190 notice Notice, Hearing Fri 10/22 3:49 PM
Notice of Hearing on Rule 9019 Motion Related [+] filed by Oscar N. Pinkas on behalf of A.B.C. Carpet Co., Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2021 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ) Objections due by 10/26/2021, (Pinkas, Oscar)
Related: [-] 189 ,188 ,187
189 189 order Motion, Shorten Time Fri 10/22 3:04 PM
Order Signed on 10/22/2021 Shortening the Notice Period with Respect to the Joint Motion of the Debtors and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Entry of an Order Approving Settlement Between the Debtors, the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, 888 Capital Partners, LLC, and Paulette Cole. The Hearing Will be Held on 10/27/2021 at 10:00 a.m. via Videoconference (ZoomGov). Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 188
188 188 motion Motion, Shorten Time Fri 10/22 12:52 PM
Motion to Shorten Time Joint Motion of the Debtors and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Entry of an Order Shortening Notice Period With Respect to the Joint Motion of the Debtors and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Section 105(A) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Approving Settlement Between the Debtors, the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, 888 Capital Partners, LLC, and Paulette Cole Related [+] filed by Oscar N. Pinkas on behalf of A.B.C. Carpet Co., Inc.. (Pinkas, Oscar)
Related: [-] 187
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
187 187 motion Motion, Approve Compromise Fri 10/22 12:48 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise Joint Motion of the Debtors and the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors for Entry of an Order Pursuant to Section 105(A) of the Bankruptcy Code and Rule 9019 of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure Approving Settlement Between the Debtors, the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors, 888 Capital Partners, LLC, and Paulette Cole filed by Oscar N. Pinkas on behalf of A.B.C. Carpet Co., Inc.. (Pinkas, Oscar)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Thursday, October 21, 2021
186 186 2 pgs notice Notice, Sale Thu 10/21 10:00 PM
Notice of Sale Notice of Cancellation of Auction and Designation of Stalking Horse Bidder as Successful Bidder Related [+] filed by Oscar N. Pinkas on behalf of A.B.C. Carpet Co., Inc.. (Pinkas, Oscar)
Related: [-] 120
185 185 3 pgs notice Notice, Meeting of Creditors Thu 10/21 5:20 PM
Notice of Meeting of Creditors Notice of Telephonic Creditors' Meeting Related [+] filed by Shannon Anne Scott on behalf of United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/26/2021 at 02:00 PM at Office of UST (TELECONFERENCE ONLY). (Scott, Shannon)
Related: [-] 88
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
184 184 2 pgs notice Notice, Proposed Order/Presentment Wed 10/20 8:06 PM
Notice of Proposed Order Notice of Filing of Revised Proposed Order Authorizing Employment and Retention of Stretto, as Administrative Advisor for the Debtors, Effective as of the Petition Date Related [+] filed by Oscar N. Pinkas on behalf of A.B.C. Carpet Co., Inc.. with hearing to be held on 10/27/2021 at 10:00 AM at Videoconference (ZoomGov) (DSJ)(Pinkas, Oscar)
Related: [-] 159 ,158
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Att: 2 6 pgs Exhibit B - Redline
183 183 7 pgs ans Statement Wed 10/20 7:51 PM
Statement /Notice of Filing of Amendment No. 2 to Stalking Horse Agreement filed by Oscar N. Pinkas on behalf of A.B.C. Carpet Co., Inc.. (Pinkas, Oscar)
Related: [-]
182 182 42 pgs ans Statement Wed 10/20 7:29 PM
Statement /Supplemental Notice of Cure Costs and Proposed Assumption and Assignment of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases in Connection with Sale Related [+] filed by Oscar N. Pinkas on behalf of A.B.C. Carpet Co., Inc.. (Pinkas, Oscar)
Related: [-] 120
181 181 3 pgs misc Affidavit Wed 10/20 12:45 PM
Affidavit Declaration of Disinterestedness of Kessler PR Group Pursuant to the Order Authorizing the Retention and Compensation of Certain Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business Related [+] Filed by Oscar N. Pinkas on behalf of A.B.C. Carpet Co., Inc.. (Pinkas, Oscar)
Related: [-] 130
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
180 180 1 pgs order Application, Pro Hac Vice Tue 10/19 12:31 PM
Order Signed on 10/19/2021 Admitting Jeffrey S. Wisler to Practice Pro Hac Vice in this Court. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 176
Monday, October 18, 2021
179 179 misc Certificate of Service Mon 10/18 4:24 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Catherine V. LoTempio on behalf of Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors. (LoTempio, Catherine)
Related: [-] 156 ,155
178 178 2 pgs notice Notice, Hearing Mon 10/18 12:57 PM
Notice of Hearing Notice of Cancellation of Hearing Scheduled for October 19, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. (ET) Related [+] filed by Oscar N. Pinkas on behalf of A.B.C. Carpet Co., Inc.. (Pinkas, Oscar)
Related: [-] 134 ,168 ,133 ,170
177 177 misc Affidavit Mon 10/18 11:26 AM
Affidavit /Declaration of Disinterestedness of Powley & Gibson, P.C. Pursuant to the Order Authorizing the Retention and Compensation of Certain Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business Related [+] Filed by Oscar N. Pinkas on behalf of A.B.C. Carpet Co., Inc.. (Pinkas, Oscar)
Related: [-] 130
176 176 motion Application, Pro Hac Vice Admission Mon 10/18 11:08 AM
Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission for Jeffrey C. Wisler of Connolly Gallagher LLP filed by Brian Michael Clarke on behalf of Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Clarke, Brian)
Related: [-]
175 175 notice Notice, Appearance Mon 10/18 11:06 AM
Notice of Appearance filed by Brian Michael Clarke on behalf of Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company. (Clarke, Brian)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Mon 10/18 11:09 AM
Receipt of Application for Pro Hac Vice Admission([LINK 21-11591 dsj] ) [motion,122] ( 200.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A15533719. Fee amount 200.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #176
Friday, October 15, 2021
174 174 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 10/15 5:01 PM
Affidavit of Service (Supplemental) re: Debtors Motion for Entry of Interim and Final Orders (I)authorizing the Debtors to Enter Into and Perform Under The Consulting Agreement, (II) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Sell Clearance and Consigned Goods Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances and (B) Remit Proceeds Arising From Sale of Consigned Goods for Payment of Putative Consignment Vendors, and (III) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 40), Interim Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Enter Into and Perform Under the Consulting Agreement, (II) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Sell Clearance and Consigned Goods Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances and (B) Remit Proceeds Arising From Sale of Consigned Goods for Payment of Putative Consignment Vendors, and (III) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 52), Debtors Motion for Entry of an Order (I) Authorizing the Retention and Compensation of Certain Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business and (II) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 62), Debtors Motion for Entry of Order (I) Authorizing Rejection of a Certain Unexpired Lease Effective as of the Rejection Date (II) Authorizing Abandonment of Any Personal Property Related Thereto, and (III) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 63), Debtors Application Pursuant to Sections 105, 501, 502 and 503 of the Bankruptcy Code, Bankruptcy Rules 2002 and 3003(c) and Local Bankruptcy Rule 3003-1, for an Order Establishing Bar Dates for Filing Proofs of Claim and Approving Form and Manner of Notice Thereof (Docket No. 64), Notice of Hearing on Certain Matters Scheduled for October 5, 2021 (Docket No. 65), Notice of Filing of Proposed Final Order (I) Authorizing the Debtors to Enter Into and Perform Under the Consulting Agreement, (II) Authorizing the Debtors to (A) Sell Clearance and Consigned Goods Free and Clear of All Liens, Claims and Encumbrances and (B) Remit Proceeds Arising From Sale of Consigned Goods for Payment of Putative Consignment Vendors, and (III) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 69)Notice of Filing of Proposed Final Order (I) Authorizing, but Not Directing, Debtors to (A) Continue to Maintain Their Insurance Policies and Programs and Surety Bond Program, (B) Honor Certain Obligations With Respect Thereto, and (C) Pay Related Prepetition Obligations and (II) Modifying the Automatic Stay With Respect to the Workers Compensation Program (Docket No. 73), Notice of Chapter 11 Bankruptcy Case (Docket No. 88), Notice of Sale, Bidding Procedures, Auction, and Sale Hearing (Docket No. 142), Notice of Bar Dates for Filing Proofs of Claim & Official Form 410 Proof of Claim Form & Instructions Related [+] filed by Stretto Claims Agent.(Klamser, Robert)
Related: [-] 69 ,65 ,52 ,142 ,88 ,73 ,63 ,62 ,40 ,64
173 173 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 10/15 5:01 PM
Affidavit of Service re: Certificate of No Objection Regarding Debtors' Second Motion for Entry of Order (I)Authorizing Rejection of a Certain Unexpired Lease Effective as of the Rejection Date (II) Authorizing Abandonment of Any Personal Property Related Thereto, and (III) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 168) Related [+] filed by Stretto.(Klamser, Robert)
Related: [-] 168
172 172 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 10/15 5:01 PM
Affidavit of Service re: Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Stretto, as Administrative Advisor for the Debtors, Effective as of the Petition Date (Docket No. 158) & Notice of Hearing on Debtors' Application for Entry of an Order Authorizing the Employment and Retention of Stretto, as Administrative Advisor for the Debtors, Effective as of the Petition Date (Docket No. 159) Related [+] filed by Stretto.(Klamser, Robert)
Related: [-] 159 ,158
171 171 misc Affidavit of Service Fri 10/15 5:01 PM
Affidavit of Service re: Notice of Filing Redacted Information Regarding the Compensation Plans (Docket No. 147), Declaration of Disinterestedness of Anchin, Block & Anchin LLP Pursuant to the Order Authorizing the Retention and Compensation of Certain Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business (Docket No. 149), Declaration of Disinterestedness of Anchin, Block & Anchin LLP Pursuant to the Order Authorizing the Retention and Compensation of Certain Professionals Utilized in the Ordinary Course of Business (Docket No. 150) & Notice of Filing of Proposed Order (A) Authorizing Sale of All or Substantially All of Debtors' Assets Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Interests and Encumbrances, (B) Authorizing Assumption and Assignment or Rejection of Executory Contracts and Unexpired Leases, and (C) Granting Related Relief (Docket No. 152) Related [+] filed by Stretto Claims Agent.(Klamser, Robert)
Related: [-] 152 ,150 ,149 ,147
170 170 order Motion. Authorize Fri 10/15 12:44 PM
Order Signed on 10/15/2021 (I) Authorizing Rejection of a Certain Unexpired Lease Effective as of the Rejection Date (II) Authorizing Abandonment of Any Personal Property Related Thereto and (III) Granting Related Relief. Related [+] (Calderon, Lynda)
Related: [-] 133