A.B.C. Oriental Carpets, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:21-bk-11591
Lead case is: 1:21-bk-11591
New York Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David S Jones |
Case #: | 1:21-bk-11593 |
Case Filed: | Sep 08, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jul 12, 2022 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1,000-5,000 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $50,000,001 to $100 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
A.B.C. Oriental Carpets, Inc.
888 Broadway
New York, NY 10003-1280 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee U.S. Federal Office Building 201 Varick Street, Room 1006
New York, NY 10014 |
Docket last updated: 15 minutes ago |
Tuesday, July 12, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
notice
~Generic~ NOTICE
Tue 07/19 12:03 PM
An order has been entered in accordance with section 350 of the BankruptcyCode closing the chapter 11 cases of A.B.C. Home Furnishings, Inc., CaseNo. 21-11592 (DSJ) and A.B.C. Oriental Carpets, Inc., Case No. 21-11593 DSJ). All further pleadings and other papers shall be filed, and allfurther docket entries shall be made, in the case of A.B.C. Carpet Co.,Inc., Case No. 21-11591 (DSJ). (Lopez, Mary) |
|
6 | 6
order
Order, Final Decree
Tue 07/12 3:10 PM
Order Signed on 7/12/2022 (I) Closing Certain Chapter 11 Cases; (II) Granting Final Decrees in Certain Closed Chapter 11 Cases; (III) Amending Caption of Remaining Case; and (IV) Granting Related Relief. (Calderon, Lynda) |
|
misc
Close Bankruptcy Case
Tue 07/19 12:05 PM
Case Closed. (Lopez, Mary) |
||
Monday, October 25, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
misc
Statement of Financial Affairs
Mon 10/25 9:57 PM
Statement of Financial Affairs - Non-Individual Statement of Financial Affairs for A.B.C. Oriental Carpets, Inc. (Case No. 21-11593 Filed by Oscar N. Pinkas on behalf of A.B.C. Oriental Carpets, Inc.. (Pinkas, Oscar) |
|
4 | 4
misc
Schedules
Mon 10/25 9:56 PM
Schedules filed: Schedule A/B - Non-Individual, Schedule D - Non-Individual, Schedule E/F - Non-Individual, Schedule G - Non-Individual, Schedule H - Non-Individual Schedules of Assets and Liabilities for A.B.C. Oriental Carpets, Inc. (Case No. 21-11593 Filed by Oscar N. Pinkas on behalf of A.B.C. Oriental Carpets, Inc.. (Pinkas, Oscar) |
|
Monday, September 13, 2021 | ||
misc
Case Association - Joint Administration
Mon 09/13 9:48 AM
Case Joint Administration. An Order has been entered in accordance with rule 1015(b) of the Bankruptcy Rules directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of A.B.C. Carpet Co., Inc., A.B.C.Home Furnishings, Inc., and A.B.C. Oriental Carpets, Inc. The docket in Case No. 21-11591 should be consulted for all matters affecting the case. (Lopez, Mary) |
||
Friday, September 10, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
order
Motion, Joint Administration
Fri 09/10 3:34 PM
Order Signed on 9/10/2021 Directing Joint Administration of 21-11591 21-11592 and 21-11593 Under 21-11591 A.B.C. Carpet Co., Inc. as the Lead Case. (Calderon, Lynda) |
|
Thursday, September 09, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
motion
Motion, Joint Administration
Thu 09/09 12:10 AM
Motion for Joint Administration filed by Oscar N. Pinkas on behalf of A.B.C. Oriental Carpets, Inc.. (Pinkas, Oscar) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Order | ||
misc
Add Judge
Thu 09/09 8:23 AM
Judge David S Jones added to the case. (Porter, Minnie) |
||
misc
Case Association - Related
Thu 09/09 8:37 AM
Case Related: (Case Number: 21-11333 Amma421, LLC) (Porter, Minnie) |
||
Wednesday, September 08, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
19
pgs
misc
Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)
Wed 09/08 11:52 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individual. Order for Relief Entered. Filed by Oscar N. Pinkas of Greenberg Traurig, LLP on behalf of A.B.C. Oriental Carpets, Inc.. (Pinkas, Oscar) |