Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Roy K Altman
Referred: Patrick M Hunt
Case #: 0:21-cv-61930
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Sep 13, 2021
Terminated:Jun 27, 2022
Last checked: Saturday Mar 12, 2022 5:46 AM EST
Defendant
SOUTHERN CHUTE, INC.
Represented By
Garrett Scott Kamen
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
Cathy Mattson Stutin
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Plaintiff
WALTER STANLEY
Represented By
Tanesha LaShay Marie Walls
Saenz & Anderson, PLLC
contact info
Aron Smukler
Saenz , Anderson, PLLC
contact info
Ruben Martin Saenz
Saenz & Anderson, PLLC
contact info
Tanesha Walls Blye
Saenz & Anderson, PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, June 28, 2022
32 32 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Tue 06/28 5:13 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal With Prejudice by SOUTHERN CHUTE, INC. (Kamen, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 27, 2022
31 31 1 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Mon 06/27 12:57 PM
ORDER Dismissing Case / Closing Case. (Without Prejudice) Motions terminated:9 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint filed by SOUTHERN CHUTE, INC.. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/24/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 24, 2022
minutes Status Conference Fri 06/24 3:45 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roy K. Altman: Status Conference held on 6/24/2022. Total time in court: 5 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Garrett Scott Kamen, Tanesha Walls Blye. Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 305-301-3276 / mjsfcs@aol.com. (mg01)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 22, 2022
29 29 order Scheduling Order Wed 06/22 4:55 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING VIDEO STATUS CONFERENCES: Status Conference set for 6/24/2022 02:00 PM in Miami Division before Judge Roy K. Altman. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 6/22/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 20, 2022
28 28 notice Notice (Other) Fri 05/20 5:28 PM
NOTICE by WALTER STANLEY JOINT NOTICE OF NON-SETTLEMENT (Blye, Tanesha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 17, 2022
minutes Status Conference Tue 05/17 3:54 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Roy K. Altman: Status Conference held on 5/17/2022. Total time in court: 5 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Garrett Scott Kamen, Tanesha Walls Blye. Court Reporter: Francine Salopek, 305-301-3276 / mjsfcs@aol.com. (mg01)
Related: [-]
order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 05/17 6:54 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER requiring the parties to submit a joint notice of settlement or non-settlement by Friday, May 20, 2022. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/17/2022. (mg01)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 09, 2022
25 25 2 pgs order Order Setting Status Conference Tue 05/10 8:38 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING VIDEO STATUS CONFERENCES: Status Conference set for 5/17/2022 03:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Roy K. Altman. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs order Order Setting Status Conference Tue 05/10 6:55 AM
ORDER Scheduling Video Status Conferences: Status Conference set for 5/17/2022 03:30 PM in Miami Division before Judge Roy K. Altman. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/9/2022. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 06, 2022
23 23 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Mon 05/09 8:36 AM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Carlos J. Burruezo Mediation Hearing set for 6/17/2022 09:00 AM Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 5/6/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 24, 2022
22 22 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/24 4:41 PM
NOTICE by WALTER STANLEY JOINT NOTICE OF FILING PROPOSED ORDER SCHEDULING MEDIATION (Walls, Tanesha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
Tuesday, January 04, 2022
21 21 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Tue 01/04 4:17 PM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE (Jury Trial set for 11/21/2022 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman., Calendar Call set for 11/15/2022 01:45 PM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge Roy K. Altman., Amended Pleadings due by 2/21/2022., Discovery due by 7/26/2022., Expert Discovery due by 7/26/2022., Joinder of Parties due by 2/21/2022., Mediation Deadline 8/9/2022., In Limine Motions due by 10/17/2022., Dispositive Motions due by 8/17/2022., Motions due by 8/17/2022., Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/17/2022.) All pretrial non-dispositive and discovery matters are hereby referred to United States Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/4/2022. See attached document for full details. (jbs)
Related: [-]
20 20 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 01/04 12:03 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by SOUTHERN CHUTE, INC. identifying Other Affiliate Neil Ribner, Other Affiliate Joanna Ribner, Other Affiliate Ribner Properties LLC for SOUTHERN CHUTE, INC. (Kamen, Garrett)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Tue 01/04 11:30 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot13 Motion for Extension of Time in light of the Plaintiff's14 Response to the Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 1/4/2022. (bsy)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 01/05 8:15 AM
Set Deadline per DE21 Pretrial Stipulation due by 11/7/2022. (jbs)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 03, 2022
17 17 respm Response in Support of Motion Mon 01/03 11:11 AM
RESPONSE in Support re9 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint filed by SOUTHERN CHUTE, INC.. (Kamen, Garrett)
Related: [-]
notice Clerks Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Mon 01/03 11:58 AM
Clerks Notice to Filer re16 Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents Not Entered ; ERROR - The Filer failed to enter all Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents from the Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement. Filer is instructed to refile their Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement and enter the missing Other Affiliates/Corp Parents. Note - Other Affiliates/Corporate Parents do not appear on the docket sheet. (Neil Ribner; Joanna Ribner, and Ribner Properties LLC) (jbs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 30, 2021
16 16 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 12/30 4:45 PM
Defendant's Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by SOUTHERN CHUTE, INC. (Kamen, Garrett)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Thu 12/30 4:28 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by SOUTHERN CHUTE, INC.(Kamen, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, December 28, 2021
14 14 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 12/28 6:27 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint filed by WALTER STANLEY. Replies due by 1/4/2022. (Smukler, Aron)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 27, 2021
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Mon 12/27 11:41 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to9 Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint by WALTER STANLEY. (Smukler, Aron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 16, 2021
12 12 1 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Thu 12/16 3:42 PM
ORDER REQUIRING SCHEDULING REPORT AND CERTIFICATES OF INTERESTED PARTIES. Joint Scheduling Report due by 12/30/2021. Signed by Judge Roy K. Altman on 12/16/2021. See attached document for full details. (cds)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 14, 2021
11 11 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 12/14 4:48 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by WALTER STANLEY. SOUTHERN CHUTE, INC. served on 12/14/2021, response/answer due 1/4/2022. (Walls, Tanesha)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 12/14 3:10 PM
Defendant's Corporate Disclosure Statement pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1 by SOUTHERN CHUTE, INC. (Kamen, Garrett)
Related: [-]
9 9 motion Dismiss Tue 12/14 3:08 PM
Defendant's MOTION to Dismiss1 Complaint by SOUTHERN CHUTE, INC.. Responses due by 12/28/2021 (Kamen, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 21, 2021
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 10/21 3:12 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Cathy Mattson Stutin on behalf of SOUTHERN CHUTE, INC.. Attorney Cathy Mattson Stutin added to party SOUTHERN CHUTE, INC.(pty:dft). (Stutin, Cathy)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Thu 10/21 3:11 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Garrett Scott Kamen on behalf of SOUTHERN CHUTE, INC.. Attorney Garrett Scott Kamen added to party SOUTHERN CHUTE, INC.(pty:dft). (Kamen, Garrett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 20, 2021
6 6 notice Notice of Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions Wed 10/20 3:15 PM
Notice of NO Pending, Refiled, Related or Similar Actions by WALTER STANLEY (Walls, Tanesha)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 10/20 3:13 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement - NONE disclosed by WALTER STANLEY (Walls, Tanesha)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 19, 2021
4 4 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 10/19 9:42 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by WALTER STANLEY. All Defendants. (Smukler, Aron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 14, 2021
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 09/14 8:49 AM
Summons Issued as to SOUTHERN CHUTE, INC. (jbs)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 13, 2021
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 09/13 7:13 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15006829, filed by WALTER STANLEY.(Walls, Tanesha)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)
order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Tue 09/14 8:44 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Roy K. Altman and Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (jbs)
Related: [-]