KDA PROPERTIES, LLC
Colorado Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Elizabeth E Brown |
Case #: | 1:21-bk-14821 |
Case Filed: | Sep 21, 2021 |
Dismissed: | Jun 13, 2022 |
Terminated: | Aug 17, 2022 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 1-49 |
Est. Assets | $10,000,001 to $50 million |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,001 to $10 million |
Nature of Business | Single Asset Real Estate |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
KDA PROPERTIES, LLC
1612 Wazee St
Denver, CO 80202-1314 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
US Trustee
Byron G. Rogers Federal Building 1961 Stout St. Ste. 12-200
Denver, CO 80294 |
1. | LoDo hotel files for bankruptcy in bid to slow down foreclosure process (denverpost.com) |
Submitted Fri 09/24/2021 | |
Docket last updated: 21 minutes ago |
Wednesday, August 17, 2022 | ||
160 | 160
court
Close Bankruptcy Case (Chapter 11)
Wed 08/17 2:38 PM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (jss) |