SPICER et al v. BIDEN et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Dabney L Friedrich |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-02493 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 05:704 Labor Litigation |
Case Filed: | Sep 23, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jul 11, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Mar 23, 2022 4:29 AM EDT |
Defendant
JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
KATHERINE L. PETRELIUS
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CHARLES A. RUPPERSBERGER, III
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
CATHERINE M. RUSSELL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
RAPHAEL J. THALAKOTTUR
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
SEAN M. SPICER
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
RUSSELL T. VOUGHT
|
Represented By
|
1. | Federal judge throws out Sean Spicer lawsuit over dismissal from Navy board (washingtonexaminer.com) |
Submitted Thu 07/14/2022 | |
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Monday, August 14, 2023 | ||
20 | 20
appeal
USCA Order
Tue 08/15 10:14 AM
ORDER of USCA as to18 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by SEAN M. SPICER, RUSSELL T. VOUGHT ; Case is dismissed, no mandate shall issued. USCA Case Number 22-5215 (znmw) |
|
Friday, August 12, 2022 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Mon 08/15 4:13 PM
USCA Case Number 22-5215 for18 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by SEAN M. SPICER, RUSSELL T. VOUGHT. (zed) |
||
Thursday, August 11, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
appeal
Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA
Thu 08/11 2:53 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The Court of Appeals fee was paid re18 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (zed) |
|
Wednesday, August 10, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
appeal
Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit
Wed 08/10 9:47 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to17 Order on Motion to Dismiss by SEAN M. SPICER, RUSSELL T. VOUGHT. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number ADCDC-9431790. Fee Status: Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (Mills, Christopher) |
|
Monday, July 11, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
6
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Mon 07/11 1:28 PM
ORDER granting the defendants'12 Motion to Dismiss. See text for details. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on July 11, 2022. (lcdlf1) |
|
Wednesday, March 16, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance
Wed 03/16 12:00 PM
NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF APPEARANCE as to JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR, KATHERINE L. PETRELIUS, CHARLES A. RUPPERSBERGER, III, CATHERINE M. RUSSELL, RAPHAEL J. THALAKOTTUR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Attorney Christopher D. Dodge terminated. (Dodge, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Tue 03/15 4:53 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy Samuel Bloch Newman on behalf of All Defendants (Newman, Jeremy) |
|
Monday, February 07, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Mon 02/07 6:49 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion to dismiss filed by JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR, KATHERINE L. PETRELIUS, CHARLES A. RUPPERSBERGER, III, CATHERINE M. RUSSELL, RAPHAEL J. THALAKOTTUR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Dodge, Christopher) |
|
Monday, January 24, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
30+
pgs
respm
Memorandum in opposition to motion
Mon 01/24 4:35 PM
Memorandum in opposition to re12 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SEAN M. SPICER, RUSSELL T. VOUGHT.(Mills, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, January 10, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Dismiss
Mon 01/10 7:56 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR, KATHERINE L. PETRELIUS, CHARLES A. RUPPERSBERGER, III, CATHERINE M. RUSSELL, RAPHAEL J. THALAKOTTUR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Dodge, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, December 20, 2021 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 12/20 12:20 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the parties'11 Proposed Briefing Schedule, the Court adopts the following briefing schedule: the defendants shall file any dispositive motion on or before January 10, 2022; the plaintiffs shall file any response to that motion on January 24, 2022; and the defendants shall file any reply on or before February 7, 2022. So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 20, 2021. (lcdlf1) |
||
Friday, December 17, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Proposed Briefing Schedule
Fri 12/17 10:56 PM
PROPOSED BRIEFING SCHEDULE for Defendants' Rule 12(b) motion by JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR, KATHERINE L. PETRELIUS, CHARLES A. RUPPERSBERGER, III, CATHERINE M. RUSSELL, RAPHAEL J. THALAKOTTUR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Dodge, Christopher) |
|
Tuesday, December 14, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
service
Certificate of Service
Tue 12/14 7:54 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by SEAN M. SPICER, RUSSELL T. VOUGHT re1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued Electronically . (Mills, Christopher) |
|
Saturday, December 04, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
12
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction Order on Motion to Hold in Abeyance
Sat 12/04 9:30 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION AND ORDER denying the plaintiffs'3 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on December 4, 2021. (lcdlf1) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 12/06 8:03 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Proposed Schedule due by 12/17/2021. (zjch, ) |
||
Thursday, December 02, 2021 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Hold in Abeyance
Thu 12/02 12:04 PM
Consent MOTION to Hold in Abeyance Defendants' Deadline to Respond to the Complaint by JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR, KATHERINE L. PETRELIUS, CHARLES A. RUPPERSBERGER, III, CATHERINE M. RUSSELL, RAPHAEL J. THALAKOTTUR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Dodge, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, November 30, 2021 | ||
7 | 7
respm
Reply to opposition to motion
Tue 11/30 12:47 PM
REPLY to opposition to motion re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by SEAN M. SPICER, RUSSELL T. VOUGHT.(Mills, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration Mills Declaration | ||
Wednesday, November 24, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
respm
Response to motion
Wed 11/24 5:13 PM
RESPONSE re3 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by JOSEPH R. BIDEN, JR, KATHERINE L. PETRELIUS, CHARLES A. RUPPERSBERGER, III, CATHERINE M. RUSSELL, RAPHAEL J. THALAKOTTUR, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA.(Dodge, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of Christopher D. Dodge, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Bylaws, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B - November 2020 Membership List, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C - September 27, 2021 Minutes, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Webster's Third New International Dictionary | ||
Monday, November 15, 2021 | ||
order
.Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines
Mon 11/15 1:41 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon review of the plaintiffs'3 Motion for a Preliminary Injunction, including the plaintiffs' request for a hearing pursuant to Local Rule 65.1(d), the Court adopts the following briefing schedule: the government shall respond to the plaintiffs'3 Motion for Preliminary Injunction on or before November 24, 2021, and the plaintiffs shall file any reply on or before December 1, 2021. Because the plaintiffs represent that they will not suffer irreparable harm until December 6, 2021, and because this schedule allows the Court to hold a hearing before that date, if necessary, the Court finds the above this briefing schedule "will not prejudice the parties." LCvR 65.1(d). So Ordered by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 15, 2021. (lcdlf1) |
||
Friday, November 12, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 11/12 11:20 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher D. Dodge on behalf of All Defendants (Dodge, Christopher) |
|
Friday, November 05, 2021 | ||
4 | 4
order
.Order
Fri 11/05 4:50 PM
STANDARD ORDER for Civil Cases. See text for details. Signed by Judge Dabney L. Friedrich on November 5, 2021. (lcdlf1) |
|
Wednesday, November 03, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
motion
Preliminary Injunction
Wed 11/03 2:59 PM
MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by SEAN M. SPICER, RUSSELL T. VOUGHT.(Mills, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Declaration of Sean Spicer, | ||
Att: 4 Declaration of Russell Vought | ||
Friday, September 24, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
service
Electronic Summons Issued
Fri 09/24 1:06 PM
SUMMONS (6) Issued Electronically as to All Defendants. (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(znmg) |
|
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 09/24 12:59 PM
Case Assigned to Judge Dabney L. Friedrich. (znmg) |
||
Thursday, September 23, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 09/23 3:07 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8754229) filed by RUSSELL T. VOUGHT, SEAN M. SPICER.(Mills, Christopher) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit 1: Charter, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit 2: Membership Balance Plan, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit 3: Russell Letter to Spicer, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit 4: Russell Letter to Vought, | ||
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 6 Summons, | ||
Att: 7 Summons, | ||
Att: 8 Summons, | ||
Att: 9 Summons, | ||
Att: 10 Summons, | ||
Att: 11 Summons |