Robert Kalani v. California Food Management, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Percy Anderson |
Referred: | Jean P Rosenbluth |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-06150 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12101 Americans With Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 06, 2014 |
Terminated: | Nov 14, 2014 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 12, 2015 12:37 AM PDT |
Defendant
Arnold and Mabel Beckman Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
California Food Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Christine Caudle
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Cool Water Associates
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Robert Kalani
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Friday, November 14, 2014 | ||
24 | 24 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) filed by Plaintiff Robert Kalani.(Moore, Tanya) | |
Wednesday, November 12, 2014 | ||
23 | 23 IN CHAMBERS - ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. The Court has been advised by counsel that this matter has settled. The parties have ten (10) days from the date of this order or until the next scheduled court appearance, whichever is shorter, to file with the court a dismissal of the action or to appear, in-person or telephonically with their clients, to place the settlement on the record. The parties may contact the deputy clerk of the court to calendar the appearance. If the parties do not dismiss the action or do not place the settlement on the record, the matter will remain on the Court's active trial calendar with all pretrial and trial dates in effect. IT IS SO ORDERED. (jloz) | |
Tuesday, November 11, 2014 | ||
22 | 22 NOTICE of Settlement of Action filed by Plaintiff Robert Kalani. (Moore, Tanya) | |
Friday, October 24, 2014 | ||
21 | 21 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint19 . The following error(s) was found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (bp) | |
Thursday, October 23, 2014 | ||
20 | 20 SCHEDULING MEETING OF COUNSEL [FRCP 16,25(f)] SCHEDULING CONFERENCE set for December 1, 2014, at 10:30 a.m. (See document for details) (bp) | |
19 | 19 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Arnold and Mabel Beckman Foundation, California Food Management, LLC, Christine Caudle, Cool Water Associates.(Sleeth, Jack) | |
Att: 1 Proof of Service | ||
Monday, October 06, 2014 | ||
18 | 18 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR DEFENDANTS TO ANSWER INITIAL VERIFIED COMPLAINT by Judge Percy Anderson17 . No later than October 26, 2014, Defendants shall file and serve an answer. No further extensions will be granted. (im) | |
Thursday, October 02, 2014 | ||
17 | 17 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 10/26/14 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendants Arnold and Mabel Beckman Foundation, California Food Management, LLC, Christine Caudle, Cool Water Associates.(Attorney Jack M Sleeth, Jr added to party Arnold and Mabel Beckman Foundation(pty:dft), Attorney Jack M Sleeth, Jr added to party Christine Caudle(pty:dft), Attorney Jack M Sleeth, Jr added to party Cool Water Associates(pty:dft))(Sleeth, Jack) | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Proof of Service | ||
Wednesday, September 10, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to California Food Management, LLC answer now due 10/26/2014, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Defendant California Food Management, LLC.(Attorney Jack M Sleeth, Jr added to party California Food Management, LLC(pty:dft))(Sleeth, Jack) | |
Friday, September 05, 2014 | ||
15 | 15 First STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to re Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),13 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),12 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),9 filed by plaintiff Robert Kalani.(Moore, Tanya) | |
14 | 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert Kalani, upon Defendant California Food Management, LLC served on 9/5/2014, answer due 9/26/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael Aminpour - Person authorized to accept service of process,; left with Kathy Churchill - Person in Charge of Office in compliance with statute not specified by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Moore, Tanya) | |
13 | 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert Kalani, upon Defendant Arnold and Mabel Beckman Foundation served on 9/4/2014, answer due 9/25/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Joe Carruth - Person authorized to accept service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (Moore, Tanya) | |
Friday, August 29, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert Kalani, upon Defendant Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christine Caudle in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Moore, Tanya) | |
11 | 11 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Robert Kalani. correcting Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),10 (Moore, Tanya) | |
10 | 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert Kalani, upon Defendant Christine Caudle served on 8/20/2014, answer due 9/10/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Christine Caudle in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Moore, Tanya) | |
9 | 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Robert Kalani, upon Defendant Cool Water Associates served on 8/24/2014, answer due 9/14/2014. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Paul P. Henderson, Partner - Person authorized to accept service of process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (Moore, Tanya) | |
Thursday, August 07, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. All counsel are ordered to familiarize themselves with the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and the Local Rules of the Central District of California. See document for further details. (gk) | |
Wednesday, August 06, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Arnold and Mabel Beckman Foundation, California Food Management, LLC, Christine Caudle, Cool Water Associates. (et) | |
6 | 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et) | |
5 | 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (et) | |
4 | 4 CERTIFICATE AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Robert Kalani, (Moore, Tanya) | |
3 | 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by plaintiff Robert Kalani. (Moore, Tanya) | |
2 | 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Robert Kalani. (Moore, Tanya) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-14243367 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Robert Kalani. (Attorney Tanya Moore added to party Robert Kalani(pty:pla))(Moore, Tanya) |