Anadarko E&P v. California Union Ins
Original Case: 4:21-cv-01743
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcd-20548 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Oct 12, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 10, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 13, 2022 3:24 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
California Union Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Century Indemnity Company, solely as successor-in-interest to CIGNA Specialty Insurance Company, formerly known as California Union Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Anadarko E&P Onshore L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Anadarko E&P Onshore, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Jun 10 2022
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-20548 Affirmed ] Judge: EHJ , Judge: LHS , Judge: ASO. Mandate issue date is 07/05/2022 [21-20548] |
Docket last updated: 06/13/2022 3:24 AM CDT |
Tuesday, October 12, 2021 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Anadarko E&P Onshore L.L.C. 21-20548 (ABT) |