Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 3:20-bk-81507

Illinois Northern - Chicago Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Thomas M Lynch
Case #: 3:21-ap-96024
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
67 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(4), fraud as fiduciary, embezzlement, larceny
68 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(6), willful and malicious injury
41 Bankruptcy - Objection / revocation of discharge - §727(c),(d),(e)
62 Bankruptcy - Dischargeability - §523(a)(2), false pretenses, false representation, actual fraud
Case Filed:Oct 13, 2021
Terminated:Sep 26, 2022
Last checked: never
Defendant
Lucia Ramirez
226 N. West Avenue, Suite 205
Elmhurst, IL 60126
Represented By
Lucia Ramirez
contact info
Defendant
Spartans Agricultural Builders, Inc.
226 N. West Avenue, Suite 205
Elmhurst, IL 60126
Represented By
Spartans Agricultural Builders, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Marisol Luna
3483 Valley Woods Drive
Cherry Valley, IL 61016
Represented By
Marisol Luna
contact info
Defendant
Mauricio Luna
3483 Valley Woods Drive
Cherry Valley, IL 61016
Represented By
Mauricio Luna
contact info
Defendant
ML Farm Systems, Inc.
3483 Valley Woods Drive
Cherry Valley, IL 61016
Represented By
ML Farm Systems, Inc.
contact info
Defendant
Melissa Garcia
3483 Valley Woods Drive
Cherry Valley, IL 61016
Represented By
Melissa Garcia
contact info
Defendant
Luis Garcia
3483 Valley Woods Drive
Cherry Valley, IL 61016
Represented By
Luis Garcia
contact info
Defendant
Alpha Agricultural Builders Inc.
111 5th Avenue
Rochelle, IL 61068
Represented By
Alpha Agricultural Builders Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Gaston Rios Vela
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Marcelino Olivera Sanchez
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Armando Perez Aguero
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Adrian Perez Mares
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Alejandro Ortega Rivera
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Ediban Perez Vital
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Enrique Perez Vital
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Leonardo Quinteros Mata
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Carlos Ivan Quinones Rios
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Miguel Angel Ramirez Uribe
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Constantino Samuel Renteria Delgado
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Victor Alonso Reyes Espinoza
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Damian Reza Quiroga
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Marco Antonio Reza Salazar
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Oscar Rios Reyes
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Daniel Uribe Medrano
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Ventura Rivas Salas
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Julio Cesar Rodriguez Camarena
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Juan Luis Salas Salazar
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Guadencio Salvador Manuel
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Gustavo Sandoval Velazquez
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Luis Silva Limones
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Juan Francisco Silva Limones
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Luis Fernando Silva Limones
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Misael Soto Hernandez
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Cesar Omar Torres Gonzalez
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Manuel Torres Martinez
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Fabian Torres Perez
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Alejandro Torres Rosales
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Ernesto Carrillo Uribe
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Rolando Elicerio Reyes
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Nelson Elicerio Reyes
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Guadalupe Chairez Estrada
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose De La Cruz Chairez Estrada
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Ramiro Cervantes Lujano
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Jesus Castro Ruiz
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Ezequiel Castrellon Ruiz
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Carlos Castillo Rincon
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Jaime Castillo Acosta
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Juan Ramon Fernandez Saldana
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Luis Humberto Borjas Mondragon
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Angelo Beltran Diaz
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Omar Barrios Torres
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Victor Hugo Amaya Zavala
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Erik Eduardo Amador Flores
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Jorge Valentin Almaraz Acevedo
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Ezequiel Arguijo Lozano
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Misael Aguero De Leon
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Adrian Jaquez Olvera
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Fermin Melchor Ramirez
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Victor Manuel Olague Orona
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Jesus Morales Hurtado
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Montoya Maltos
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Rey David Lopez Martinez
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Martin Lopez Hernandez
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Francisco Javier Lopez Hernandez
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Benjamin Limones Ibarra
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Jose Abdiel Orosco Ibarra
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Jesus Eligio Hernandez Hernandez
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Noe Garcia Morales
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Luis Fernando Garcia Arredondo
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Manuel Gallardo Robles
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Abraham Galindo Devara
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Nestor Javier Flores Soto
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Israel Flores Hidrogo
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Alonso Flores Hidrogo
Represented By
Liborio Hernandez Roldan
Durable Power Of Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Monday, September 26, 2022
116 116 court Close Adversary Case Mon 09/26 9:43 AM
Adversary Case 3:21-ap-96024 Closed . (Gossett, Valerie)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 23, 2022
115 115 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 09/23 6:54 PM
Order on Pending Motions to Dismiss - Following the voluntary dismissal of defendant Alpha Agricultural Builders, Inc. from this adversary proceeding, the motions to dismiss the second amended complaint filed by defendants Mauricio Luna, ML Farm Systems, Inc., Melissa Garcia, and Luis Garcia (ECF No.76 ) and Spartans Agricultural Builders, Inc., and Lucia Ramirez (ECF No. #82 ) are granted based on the lack of subject matter jurisdiction, and the claims against these defendants will be dismissed without prejudice. The chapter 7 trustee's motion to dismiss the plaintiff's amended claims against the bankruptcy estate (ECF No.78 )
Related: [-]
114 114 order Dismissing Party Fri 09/23 6:23 PM
Agreed Order Granting Oral Motion to Dismiss Alpha Agricultural Builders, Inc. From Adversary Action. Signed on 9/23/2022 (Harris, Stephanie)
Related: [-]
113 113 misc Proposed Order Fri 09/23 4:51 PM
Proposed Order - Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Alpha Agricultural Builders, Inc. From Adversary Action Filed by Nicole I Pellerin on behalf of Alpha Agricultural Builders Inc. Related [+]. (Pellerin, Nicole)
Related: [-] 76 Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding
Thursday, September 22, 2022
112 112 utility U - Draft Order Thu 09/22 11:44 AM
Draft Order (oral motion to dismiss Alpha Agricultural Builders) due by 9/28/2022. (Kuczynski, Mimi)
Related: [-]