Cherokee Nation v. McKinsey and Company, Inc.
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:21-md-02996
Lead case: 3:21-md-02996
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Charles R Breyer |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-08061 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2021 |
Case in other court: | Oklahoma Eastern, 6:21-cv-00200 |
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 12, 2022 2:56 AM PDT |
Defendant
McKinsey and Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Cherokee Nation
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Thursday, November 04, 2021 | ||
utility
MDL Member Case
Thu 11/04 4:55 PM
MEMBER CASE OPENED MDL 2996: Eastern District of Oklahoma, 6:21-cv-00200, Cherokee Nation v. McKinsey and Company, Inc., Opened in California Northern District as 3:21-cv-08061-CRB pursuant to a Transfer Order issued 10/05/2021 cc: JPMDL (wsn, COURT STAFF) |
||
Thursday, October 14, 2021 | ||
26 | 26
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice
Thu 10/14 4:06 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE Acknowledging Receipt of Case Transfer in from the Eastern District of Oklahoma, Case No. 6:21cv00200RAW. (jmlS, COURT STAFF) |
|
25 | 25
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer
Thu 10/14 4:00 PM
Case transferred in from District of Oklahoma Eastern; Case Number 6:21-cv-00200. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
Tuesday, October 05, 2021 | ||
24 | 24 CERTIFIED TRANSFER ORDER (MDL No. 2996) transferring case to the Northern District of California (case terminated) (tls, Deputy Clerk) | |
Wednesday, August 11, 2021 | ||
23 | 23 REPLY to Response to Motion by McKinsey and Company, Inc. ;(Evans, Kyle) | |
Monday, August 09, 2021 | ||
22 | 22 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White denying21 Defendant's Motion for Leave to File Sur-Reply. (tls, Deputy Clerk) | |
Saturday, August 07, 2021 | ||
21 | 21 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply in Response to Plaintiff's Reply in Support of its Motion to Remand by McKinsey and Company, Inc. Responses due by 8/23/2021(Evans, Kyle) | |
Thursday, August 05, 2021 | ||
20 | 20 REPLY to Response to Motion by The Cherokee Nation ; (With attachments)(Burrage, Michael) | |
Thursday, July 29, 2021 | ||
18 | 18 RESPONSE to Motion by The Cherokee Nation ; (With attachments)(Burrage, Michael) | |
Monday, July 26, 2021 | ||
19 | 19 ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White granting13 Defendant's Corrected Motion for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12. (tls, Deputy Clerk) (tls, Deputy Clerk). Modified on 8/2/2021; NEF regenerated (tls, Deputy Clerk). | |
17 | 17 RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion by McKinsey and Company, Inc. ; (With attachments)(Evans, Kyle) | |
Friday, July 23, 2021 | ||
16 | 16 RESPONSE to Motion by The Cherokee Nation ;(Sullivan, Frank) | |
Tuesday, July 20, 2021 | ||
15 | 15 Supplement to8 MOTION to Stay by McKinsey and Company, Inc. (Curran, Jeffrey) Modified on 7/27/2021 to term motion and add link (dma, Deputy Clerk). | |
14 | 14 MINUTE ORDER by District Judge Ronald A. White directing EXPEDITED Response to be filed to13 Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer, Move or Otherwise Respond to Petition Under Rule 12 by 7/23/2021. (tls, Deputy Clerk) | |
Friday, July 16, 2021 | ||
13 | 13 Corrected MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by McKinsey and Company, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 7/30/2021(Curran, Jeffrey) | |
12 | 12 MOTION for Extension of Time to Answer by McKinsey and Company, Inc. Responses due by 7/30/2021(Curran, Jeffrey) | |
11 | 11 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - At the direction of the Court, this case is reassigned to District Judge Ronald A. White. District Judge Jodi Warmbrod Dishman no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV 21-200-RAW. (adw, Deputy Clerk) | |
10 | 10 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Robert G. McCampbell on behalf of McKinsey and Company, Inc. (McCampbell, Robert) | |
9 | 9 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk - Pursuant to receipt of an election of the District Judge Option and in accordance with LCvR 40.1(c), this case is reassigned to District Judge Jodi Warmbrod Dishman of the Western District of Oklahoma, serving in this case by designation pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 292(b). Magistrate Judge Kimberly E. West no longer assigned to case. All documents filed in this case in the future shall reflect the new case number CIV 21-200-JWD. (adw, Deputy Clerk) | |
Thursday, July 15, 2021 | ||
8 | 8 MOTION to Stay by McKinsey and Company, Inc. (With attachments) Responses due by 7/29/2021(Curran, Jeffrey) | |
7 | 7 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Jeffrey A. Curran on behalf of McKinsey and Company, Inc. (Curran, Jeffrey) | |
Monday, July 12, 2021 | ||
6 | 6 MOTION to Remand to State Court by The Cherokee Nation (With attachments) Responses due by 7/26/2021(Sullivan, Frank) | |
Friday, July 09, 2021 | ||
5 | 5 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Randa Reeves on behalf of The Cherokee Nation | |
4 | 4 ATTORNEY APPEARANCE by Michael Burrage on behalf of The Cherokee Nation (Burrage, Michael) | |
Tuesday, July 06, 2021 | ||
3 | 3 MINUTE ORDER by Court Clerk, Defendant is directed to pay the $402 filing fee within 7 days. Failure to comply with this directive will subject this action to immediate dismissal by the Court without prejudice to refiling. Consent forms provided to filing party. (Filing Fee due by 7/13/2021) (tjm, Deputy Clerk) | |
2 | 2 NOTICE of Removal from Sequoyah County District Court, case number 21-CJ-76 by McKinsey and Company, Inc. (With attachments) (tjm, Deputy Clerk) | |
1 | 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by McKinsey and Company, Inc. (tjm, Deputy Clerk) | |
FILING FEES Paid in Full on 7/6/2021 in the amount of $402, receipt number AOKEDC-1525700 by McKinsey and Company, Inc. (Evans, Kyle) | ||
Wednesday, June 02, 2021 | ||
PETITION with Jury Demand filed in State Court against McKinsey and Company, Inc. by The Cherokee Nation (tjm, Deputy Clerk) |