Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. v. Raymond & Associates, LLC et al
Alabama Southern District Court | |
Judge: | William H Steele |
Referred: | William E Cassady |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-00372 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2014 |
Terminated: | Nov 12, 2015 |
Last checked: Friday May 08, 2015 9:20 AM CDT |
Defendant
R&A Marine, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Raymond & Associates, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
United States Attorney's Office 63 South Royal Street, Suite 600
Mobile, AL 36602 |
|
Non-Party
PNC Bank, National Association
1927 1st Avenue North (Mail Stop: G5-K721-01-1)
Birmingham, AL 35203 |
Represented By
|
Non-Party
PNC Equipment Finance, LLC
1927 1st Avenue North (Mail Stop: G5-K721-01-1)
Birmingham, AL 35203 |
Represented By
|
Non-Party
PNC Financial Services Group, Inc.
1927 1st Avenue North (Mail Stop: G5-K721-01-1)
Birmingham, AL 35203 |
Represented By
|
Non-Party
SCF Barge Line LLC
|
Represented By
|
Non-Party
SCF Boats LLC
|
Represented By
|
Non-Party
TCF Equipment Finance a division of TCF National Bank
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Raymond LaForce
Terminated: 02/13/2015
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Thursday, January 21, 2016 | ||
120 | 120
order
Order
Thu 01/21 1:23 PM
Order noting the119 Status Report. Since all claims against all defendants have been resolved, the plaintiff need not file additional status reports. Signed by Chief Judge William H. Steele on 1/21/2016. (tgw) |