Minor v. Diverse Facil Solutions
Original Case: 5:20-cv-01033
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cr-50971 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Oct 15, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 29, 2021 |
Last checked: Thursday Dec 30, 2021 2:31 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
Diverse Facility Solutions
|
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Patrick Minor
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/30/2021 2:31 AM CST |
Friday, October 15, 2021 | ||
1 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Patrick Minor 21-50971 (LEF) |