Damone Daniel et al v. City of Los Angeles et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Virginia A Phillips |
Referred: | Andrew J Wistrich |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-06217 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | 28:1331 Forma Pauperis Denial |
Case Filed: | Aug 07, 2014 |
Terminated: | Oct 02, 2014 |
Last checked: Friday May 15, 2015 1:50 AM PDT |
Defendant
Officer Jeffrey Beck
|
|
Defendant
Officer Walker
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Rick Rowland
|
|
Defendant
Ralph's Grocery Company
|
|
Defendant
Officer Nuttle
|
|
Defendant
Officer Jose Moreno
|
|
Defendant
Officer Mimmick
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Officer Mark Martinec
|
|
Defendant
Officer Martel
|
|
Defendant
Los Angeles Police Department
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Officer Kurt Logan
|
|
Defendant
Officer Harding
|
|
Defendant
Officer Gnanapragasam
|
|
Defendant
Officer Dutra
|
|
Defendant
Doe Individuals
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Doe Entities
|
|
Defendant
Officer Dinse
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
City of Los Angeles
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Boyd and Associates
|
|
Defendant
Officer Boatwright
|
|
Plaintiff
Damone Daniel
1954 E. 113th Street
Los Angeles, CA 90051 |
|
Plaintiff
Nu Creations Outreach
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, November 04, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich The document is stricken RE: MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR RELIEF 9 (yb) Modified on 11/4/2014 (yb). | |
10 | 10 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR RELIEF 9 . The following error(s) was found: Case is CLOSED. In response to this notice the court may order (1) an amended or correct document to be filed (2) the document stricken or (3) take other action as the court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the court directs you to do so. (yb) | |
Monday, November 03, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 (STRICKEN PER COURT ORDER)NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM FOR RELIEF filed by DEFENDANTS City of Los Angeles, Dinse, Doe Individuals, Los Angeles Police Department, Mimmick, Walker. Motion set for hearing on 12/8/2014 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich.(Attorney Kelly N Kades added to party City of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly N Kades added to party Dinse(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly N Kades added to party Doe Individuals(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly N Kades added to party Los Angeles Police Department(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly N Kades added to party Mimmick(pty:dft), Attorney Kelly N Kades added to party Walker(pty:dft))(Kades, Kelly) Modified on 11/4/2014 (yb). Modified on 11/4/2014 (yb). | |
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, October 02, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 ORDER by Judge George H. King: Denied re REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support1 . IT WAS RECOMMENDED that the request of plaintiff/petitioner to file the action prepayment of the filing be DENIED by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (SEE ATTACHED ORDER. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (et) (Entered: 10/03/2014) | |
7 | 7 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Order on Request for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (CV 60)2 . The order (docket #2) was filed in the incorrect case due to the wrong case number on the document. The order to file the action without prepayment of the filing fee was denied by Chief Judge George H. King. A copy of the correct will be filed concurrently. JS-6. (et) | |
Tuesday, August 19, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and referred to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. (et) | |
5 | 5 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Damone Daniel. (et) | |
4 | 4 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint -3 as to Defendants Jeffrey Beck, Boatwright, Boyd and Associates, City of Los Angeles, Dinse, Dutra, Gnanapragasam, Harding, Kurt Logan, Los Angeles Police Department, Martel, Mark Martinec, Mimmick, Jose Moreno, Nuttle, Ralph's Grocery Company, Rick Rowland, Walker. (et) | |
3 | 3 COMPLAINT filed against Defendants Jeffrey Beck, Boatwright, Boyd and Associates, City of Los Angeles, Dinse, Doe Entities, Doe Individuals, Dutra, Gnanapragasam, Harding, Kurt Logan, Los Angeles Police Department, Martel, Mark Martinec, Mimmick, Jose Moreno, Nuttle, Ralph's Grocery Company, Rick Rowland, Walker. Case assigned to Judge Virginia A. Phillips and referred to Magistrate Judge Andrew J Wistrich. (Filing fee$400: IFP Granted.), filed by Plaintiff Damone Daniel. (et) | |
Att: 1 Part 1 to Complaint | ||
2 | 2 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich: Granting1 Request for Leave to Proceed in Forma. (et) | |
Thursday, August 07, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Damone Daniel.(esa) | |
Att: 1 ldgd cmp, | ||
Att: 2 ldgd cmp pt 2 cv71, | ||
Att: 3 ldgd CV30, | ||
Att: 4 summons | ||
LODGED COMPLAINT forwarded to Magistrate Judge Andrew J. Wistrich. Complaint sought to be filed by Plaintiffs Damone Daniel, Nu Creations Outreach. (esa) |