Tolliver v. Trinity Parish Foundation et al.
Delaware District Court | |
Judge: | Leonard P Stark |
Case #: | 1:14-cv-01021 |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Cause | 42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment) |
Case Filed: | Aug 08, 2014 |
Terminated: | Aug 04, 2017 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 29, 2016 11:05 AM EDT |
Defendant
Trinity Parish Foundation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Patricia Downing
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Maile Statuto
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
M. Denise Tolliver
109 Gardengate Road
Camden, DE 19934 |
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Delaware Futures Inc.
Terminated: 10/07/2014
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 19, 2020 | ||
201 | 201
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Vacate
Wed 02/19 3:59 PM
ORDER, denying Plaintiff's Motion to Vacate Judgment re D.I.199 .(Copy to Plaintiff) Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/19/2020. (myr) |
|
200 | 200
3
pgs
order
Opinion - Memorandum Opinion
Wed 02/19 3:55 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION. Signed by Judge Leonard P. Stark on 2/19/2020. (myr) |