Lombard v. Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC
Louisiana Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Eldon E Fallon |
Referred: | Karen Wells Roby |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-01825 |
Nature of Suit | 360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Aug 11, 2014 |
Terminated: | May 11, 2015 |
Last checked: Saturday May 09, 2015 11:52 AM CDT |
Defendant
Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Clevechelle Lombard
800 St. Andrew St.
New Orleans, LA 70130 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 15, 2015 | ||
23 | 23
order
Order on Motion to Alter Judgment
Wed 07/15 4:33 PM
ORDER & REASONS that Defendant's Motion22 to Alter/Amend Judgment is GRANTED IN PART AND DENIED IN PART. It is GRANTED insofar as the Court vacates its prior Order but is DENIED as to Defendant's request to grant summary judgment as unopposed and dismiss Plaintiff's claims with prejudice. Rather, the Court dismisses Plaintiff's claims without prejudice for a failure to prosecute pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(b).Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 7/14/15. (dno) |
|
Wednesday, May 13, 2015 | ||
22 | 22
motion
Alter Judgment
Wed 05/13 10:38 AM
MOTION to Alter Judgment21 Order on Motion for Summary Judgment by Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC. Motion set for 6/10/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(Davies, Trevor) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Notice of Submission | ||
Monday, May 11, 2015 | ||
21 | 21
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Mon 05/11 5:22 PM
ORDER granting18 Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment as UNOPPOSED and DISMISSING Plaintiff's case WITHOUT PREJUDICE. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 5/6/15. (dno) |
|
Wednesday, April 08, 2015 | ||
20 | 20
order
Order
Thu 04/09 8:55 AM
ORDER - The Court has before it Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment, which was scheduled for submission on March 25, 201518 . IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall submit an opposition to the Court within two weeks, on or before April 22, 2015, or the Court will grant Defendant's Motion for Summary Judgment as unopposed. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 4/8/15.(dno) |
|
Friday, March 20, 2015 | ||
19 | 19
trial
Witness and Exhibit List
Fri 03/20 4:44 PM
Witness and Exhibit List by Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC. (Davies, Trevor) |
|
Tuesday, March 10, 2015 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Summary Judgment
Tue 03/10 11:34 AM
MOTION for Summary Judgment by Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC. Motion set for 3/25/2015 09:00 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon.(Davies, Trevor) |
|
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support, | ||
Att: 2 Statement of Contested/Uncontested Facts, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit A-C, | ||
Att: 4 Notice of Submission | ||
Wednesday, February 18, 2015 | ||
17 | 17
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Deadlines
Wed 02/18 3:57 PM
ORDER granting16 Defendant's Motion for Extension of Expert Deadline to April 20, 2015. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/18/15. (dno) |
|
Monday, February 16, 2015 | ||
16 | 16
motion
Extension of Deadlines
Mon 02/16 10:20 AM
EXPARTE/CONSENT MOTION for Extension of Deadlines by Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC.(Davies, Trevor) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, February 03, 2015 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney
Tue 02/03 4:56 PM
ORDER granting14 Motion for Attorneys Julie-Ann A. Duhe'-Keating and Danny Patrick Keating to Withdraw as Counsel for Plaintiff. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 2/3/15. (dno) |
|
Monday, February 02, 2015 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Mon 02/02 12:06 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Proposed MOTION to Withdraw D. Patrick Keating as Attorney for Plaintiff by Clevechelle Lombard.(Keating, Danny) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 LR83.2.11 Certificate | ||
Friday, January 30, 2015 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Fri 01/30 2:49 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Consent MOTION to Withdraw D. Patrick Keating, Jr. as Attorney for Plaintiff by Clevechelle Lombard.(Keating, Danny) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, January 29, 2015 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Withdraw as Attorney
Thu 01/29 3:03 PM
EXPARTE/CONSENT Consent MOTION to Withdraw D. Patrick Keating as Attorney for Plaintiff by Clevechelle Lombard.Attorney Eve Sarco Reardon added to party Clevechelle Lombard(pty:pla) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
Monday, January 26, 2015 | ||
11 | 11
order
Order Set Hearings
Mon 01/26 4:53 PM
ORDER - A Telephone Status Conference is set for 1/28/2015 at 9:15 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 1/26/15.(dno) |
|
Tuesday, December 16, 2014 | ||
10 | 10
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 12/16 2:12 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: A Telephone Status Conference was held on 12/16/2014. (dno) |
|
Wednesday, October 15, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Eldon E. Fallon: A Status Conference was held on 10/15/2014. IT IS ORDERED that a Telephone Status Conference is set for 12/16/2014 at 1:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. (dno) | |
Wednesday, September 10, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference set for 10/15/2014 01:30 PM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Final Pretrial Conference set for 5/15/2015 10:00 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. Jury Trial set for 6/1/2015 08:30 AM before Judge Eldon E. Fallon. All discovery must be completed by 4/15/2015. Signed by Judge Eldon E. Fallon on 9/10/14.(dno) | |
Att: 1 Pretrial Notice Form | ||
Wednesday, August 13, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 Notice of Preliminary Scheduling Conference set for 9/10/2014 at 11:15 AM before courtroom deputy by telephone, by Clerk. (dno) | |
Tuesday, August 12, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 Correction of Docket Entry by Clerk re5 Answer to Complaint. ** Document should have been linked to another document by selecting a related document on other appropriate screen. Clerk took corrective action by linking this answer to document 1 (Notice of Removal). No further action is needed. (jtd) | |
5 | 5 ANSWER to1 Notice of Removal with Jury Demand by Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC.(Davies, Trevor) Modified on 8/12/2014 to add linkage(jtd). | |
4 | 4 Initial Case Assignment to Judge Eldon E. Fallon and Magistrate Judge Karen Wells Roby. (mmv) | |
Monday, August 11, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 Notice of Compliance with 28 U.S.C. 1447(b) by Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC.(Davies, Trevor) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A (state court record) | ||
2 | 2 Statement of Corporate Disclosure by Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC identifying Corporate Parent Winn-Dixie Stores, Inc., Corporate Parent Opal Holdings, LLC, Corporate Parent BI-LO, LLC, Corporate Parent BI-LO Holdings, LLC for Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC (Davies, Trevor) | |
1 | 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL with jury demand from Civil District Court for the Parish of Orleans, case number 2014-6309 (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 053L-4551843) filed by Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC.Attorney Trevor C. Davies added to party Winn-Dixie Montgomery, LLC(pty:dft).(Davies, Trevor) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A (State Court Record), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B (Response to Request for Admission), | ||
Att: 4 Affidavit Verifying Notice of Removal |