Griesenauer v. Millsap and Singer, P.C.
Missouri Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Ronnie L White |
Case #: | 4:14-cv-01391 |
Nature of Suit | 480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit |
Cause | 15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act |
Case Filed: | Aug 11, 2014 |
Terminated: | May 04, 2015 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 12, 2015 12:23 PM CDT |
Defendant
Millsap and Singer, P.C.
612 Spirit Drive
Saint Louis, MO 63005 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Debra Griesenauer
11425 High Plains Road
Marthasville, MO 63357 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 8 hours ago |
Monday, May 04, 2015 | ||
25 | 25
order
Judgment - (Case)
Mon 05/04 1:24 PM
JUDGMENT IT IS HEREBY ORDERED, ADJUDGED and DECREED that Millsap & Singer,P.C.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiffs First Amended Petition (ECF No. 13) is GRANTED. Count I of Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice and Count II of Plaintiffs Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 5/4/15. (JWJ) |
|
24 | 24
6
pgs
order
Memorandum & Order
Mon 05/04 1:20 PM
MEMORANDUM AND ORDER IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Millsap & Singer, P.C.'s Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Petition (ECF No. 13) is GRANTED. Count I of Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED with prejudice and Count II of Plaintiff's Complaint is DISMISSED without prejudice. An appropriate Judgment is filed herewith. re:13 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Millsap and Singer, P.C. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 5/4/15. (JWJ) |
|
Wednesday, December 10, 2014 | ||
23 | 23
order
A Docket Text Order
Wed 12/10 10:20 AM
Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Millsap & Singer, P.C.'s Motion to Supplement the Record on Millsap's Motion to Dismiss With New Authority [ECF No. 22] is GRANTED. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 12/10/14. (JEB) |
|
22 | 22
motion
Supplement
Wed 12/10 8:28 AM
MOTION to Supplement21 Reply to Response to Motion by Defendant Millsap and Singer, P.C..(Pullium, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A | ||
Friday, November 07, 2014 | ||
21 | 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re13 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Millsap and Singer, P.C.. (Pullium, Charles) | |
Tuesday, October 28, 2014 | ||
20 | 20 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Consent Motion for Enlargement of Time for Defendant to File its Reply Memorandum [ECF No. 19] is GRANTED until November 7, 2014. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/28/14. (JEB) | |
19 | 19 Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to18 Memorandum in Opposition to Motion by Defendant Millsap and Singer, P.C.. (Mosier, Scott) | |
Wednesday, October 22, 2014 | ||
18 | 18 16 pgs MEMORANDUM in Opposition re13 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Debra Griesenauer. (Brown, James) | |
17 | 17 RESPONSE to Motion re13 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff Debra Griesenauer. (Brown, James) | |
Thursday, October 16, 2014 | ||
16 | 16 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Plaintiff's Request for Additional Time to File a Memorandum in Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss [ECF No. 15] is GRANTED until October 23, 2014. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 10/16/14. (JEB) | |
15 | 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to13 MOTION to Dismiss Case ,14 Memorandum in Support of Motion by Plaintiff Debra Griesenauer. (Brown, James) | |
Thursday, October 09, 2014 | ||
14 | 14 18 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re13 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Millsap and Singer, P.C..(Pullium, Charles) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E | ||
13 | 13 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Millsap and Singer, P.C.. (Pullium, Charles) | |
Tuesday, September 30, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 ORDER... IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Millsap and Singer, P.C.'s Motion to Dismiss the Plaintiffs Petition [ECF No.7 ] is DENIED without prejudice. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/30/2014. (NEB) | |
11 | 11 DISCLOSURE OF CORPORATION INTERESTS CERTIFICATE by Defendant Millsap and Singer, P.C.. Parent companies: None, Subsidiaries: None, Publicly held company: None,. (Pullium, Charles) | |
Thursday, September 25, 2014 | ||
10 | 10 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Debra Griesenauer Process Server: Tim Harper (Brown, James) | |
9 | 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against defendant Millsap and Singer, P.C. Amendment to1 Complaint, , filed by Debra Griesenauer. Related document:1 Complaint, filed by Debra Griesenauer.(Brown, James) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Plaintiff's Exhibit 1, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Summons for Amended Complaint | ||
Thursday, September 18, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 16 pgs MEMORANDUM in Support of Motion re7 MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Millsap and Singer, P.C..(Pullium, Charles) | |
Att: 1 Exhibit A through C | ||
7 | 7 MOTION to Dismiss Case by Defendant Millsap and Singer, P.C.. (Pullium, Charles) | |
Monday, September 08, 2014 | ||
6 | 6 Docket Text ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendat Millsap & Singer, P.C.'s Motion for Enlargement of Time in Which to File Its Responsive Pleading [ECF No. 5] is GRANTED up to and including September 18, 2014. Signed by District Judge Ronnie L. White on 9/8/14. (JEB) | |
Thursday, September 04, 2014 | ||
5 | 5 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to1 Complaint, by Defendant Millsap and Singer, P.C.. (Pullium, Charles) | |
Thursday, August 21, 2014 | ||
4 | 4 ADMINISTRATIVE ORDER - IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the following cases shall be transferred to the Honorable Ronnie L. White, U.S. District Judge. All deadlines previously set remain in effect unless otherwise ordered by the Court. Case reassigned to District Judge Ronnie L. White for all further proceedings. District Judge Catherine D. Perry no longer assigned to case. Signed by District Judge Catherine D. Perry on 8/21/2014. (MRC) | |
Thursday, August 14, 2014 | ||
3 | 3 SUMMONS Returned Executed filed by Debra Griesenauer. Millsap and Singer, P.C. served on 8/14/2014, answer due 9/4/2014. (Brown, James) | |
Monday, August 11, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE OF PROCESS SERVER by Plaintiff Debra Griesenauer Process Server: Tim Harper (Brown, James) | |
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against defendant Millsap and Singer, P.C. with receipt number 0865-4445211, in the amount of $400 Jury Demand,, filed by Debra Griesenauer.(Brown, James) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Original Filing Form, | ||
Att: 3 Summons | ||
Case Opening Notification: 1 Summons(es) issued. The summons was emailed to edmo@castlelaw.net. Judge Assigned: U.S. District Judge Catherine D. Perry. (DLT) |