Louisiana et al v. Becerra et al
Louisiana Western District Court | |
Judge: | Terry A Doughty |
Referred: | Kayla D Mcclusky |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-03970 |
Nature of Suit | 899 Other Statutes - Administrative Procedure Act/Review or Appeal of Agency Decision |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 15, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 02, 2022 |
Case in other court: | 5CCA, 21-30734 |
Last checked: Saturday May 14, 2022 4:08 AM CDT |
Defendant
Xavier Becerra
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Chiquita Brooks-Lasure
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
U S Dept of Health & Human Services
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Oklahoma
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Tennessee
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Ohio
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Commonwealth of Kentucky
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of West Virginia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Utah
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of South Carolina
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Alabama
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Montana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Mississippi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Louisiana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Indiana
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Idaho
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Georgia
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
State of Arizona
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 36 minutes ago |
Friday, December 02, 2022 | ||
94 | 94
order
Judgment re Report and Recommendations Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Report and Recommendations
Fri 12/02 12:39 PM
JUDGMENT adopting91 Report and Recommendation of the Magistrate Judge, granting64 Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim, filed by Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Xavier Becerra, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, U S Dept of Health & Human Services. Signed by Judge Terry A Doughty on 12/2/2022. (crt,Crawford, A) |
|
Thursday, December 01, 2022 | ||
93 | 93
respoth
Response to Objection to Report and Recommendations
Thu 12/01 2:12 PM
RESPONSE TO OBJECTION to91 Report and Recommendations by Xavier Becerra, Chiquita Brooks-Lasure, Centers for Medicare & Medicaid Services, U S Dept of Health & Human Services. (aty,Harris, Julie) |