LTL Management LLC
New Jersey Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Michael B Kaplan |
Case #: | 3:21-bk-30589 |
Case Filed: | Oct 14, 2021 |
Dismissed: | Apr 04, 2023 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 25,001-50,000 |
Est. Assets | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Est. Liabilities | $1,000,000,001 to $10 billion |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
LTL Management LLC
501 George Street
New Brunswick, NJ 08933 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 09, 2022 5:34 AM EST |
Attorney
Genova Burns LLC
110 Allen Road, Suite 304
Basking Ridge, NJ 07920 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
J. Maria Glover
293 Eisenhower Parkway Suite 100
Livingston, NJ 07039 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Richard M. Golomb
1835 Market St. Ste. 2900
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Jones Day
Jones Day 901 Lakeside Avenue
Cleveland, OH 44114 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Law Firm of Brian W. Hofmeister, of behalf of various claimants
3131 Princeton Pike Building 5 Suite 110
Lawrenceville, NJ 08648 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Christopher M. Placitella
Cohen, Placitella & Roth P.C. 127 Maple Avenue
Red Bank, NJ 07701 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Rayburn Cooper & Durham, P.A
Rayburn Cooper & Durham, P.A 227 West Trade Street Suite 1200
Charlotte, NC 28202 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Wallace & Graham P.A.
525 North Main Street
Salisbury, NC 28144 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP
Wollmuth Maher & Deutsch LLP 500 Fifth Avenue 12th Floor
New York, NY 10110 |
Represented By
|
Attorney
John C. Woodman
Essex Richards, P.A. 1701 South Boulevard
Charlotte, NC 28203 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Ad Hoc Mesothelioma Committee
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Albertsons Companies, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Alishia Landrum, Committee Member
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Allstate Insurance Company
125 Half Mile Road Suite 300
Red Bank, NJ 07701 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Arnold & Itkin LLP
6009 Memorial Drive
Houston, TX 77007 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bausch Health Americas, Inc. f/k/a Valeant Pharmaceuticals International
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bausch Health Companies Inc. f/k/a Valeant Pharmaceuticals International, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Bausch Health US, LLC f/k/a Valeant Pharmaceuticals North America LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kellie Brewer, et al.
5473 Blair Road
Dallas, TX 75231 |
|
Creditor
Brandi Carl
Ste. 2900
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
DeSanto Canadian Class Action Plaintiffs
Lite DePalma Greenberg & Afanador 570 Broad Street Suite 1201
Newark, NJ 07102 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Kristie Lynn Doyle
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Aleathea Goodins
2610 W. Sam Houston Pkwy S, Suite 200
Houston, TX 77042 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Vincent Hill
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Julia Lathrop
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Daniel Mercer
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
N.V. De Ark
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
OnderLaw, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
PTI Royston LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
PTI Union LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Pension Benefit Guaranty Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Proposed Local Counsel to Official Committee of Talc Claimants for LTL Management, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Linda Rabasca
Ste. 2900
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Republic Indemnity Company of America
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Jeanne Stephenson
56 East Main Street Suite 301
Somerville, NJ 08876 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
The Continental Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
|
Represented By
|
Creditor
Various Claimants
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Committee of Talc Claimants
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Talc Claimants
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Talc Claimants I
|
Represented By
|
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Talc Claimants II
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
ACE Property and Casualty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
AIG Europe S.A.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
AIG Property Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
AIU Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
ASR Schadeverzekering N.V.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Atlanta International Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Aylstock, Witkin, Kreis & Overholtz, PLLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Bailey & Glasser LLP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Barnes Law Group
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Bestwall LLC
100 Peachtree Street, N.W.
Atlanta, GA 30303 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Blue Cross Blue Shield of Massachusetts, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Brown Rudnick LLP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Central National Insurance Company of Omaha
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Century Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Erwin Chemerinsky
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Claimants represented by the Barnes Law Group
Cole Schotz P.C. Felice R. Yudkin, Esq. 25 Main Street, Court Plaza North
Hackensack, NJ 07602 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Clients of Clifford Law Offices, P.C., and Taft Stettinius & Hollister, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Clients of Mendes & Mount, LLP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Cohen, Placitella & Roth, P.C.
127 Maple Ave
Red Bank, NJ 07701 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Cyprus Amax Minerals Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Cyprus Mines Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Employers Ins. Company of Wausau
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Employers Ins. of Wausau
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Employers Mutual Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Everest Reinsurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Fears Nachawati PLLC
Fears Nachawati PLLC 5489 Blair Road
Dallas, TX 75231 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Federal Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
First State Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Golomb Spirt Grunfeld
1835 Market Street Suite 2900
Philadelphia, PA 19103 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Granite State Insurance Company
One Speedwell Avenue
Morristown, NJ 07962 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Great Northern Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Imerys SA
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Imerys Talc America, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Imerys Talc Canada Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Imerys Talc Vermont, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Johnson & Johnson
One Johnson & Johnson Plaza
New Brunswick, NJ 08933 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc.
Attn: Kenneth A. Rosen, Esq. Attn: Mary E. Seymour, Esq. One Lowenstein Drive
Roseland, NJ 07463 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Kazan, McClain, Satterley & Greenwood, PLC
55 Harrison St #400
Oakland, CA 94607 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Levy Konigsberg LLP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Lexington Insurance Company
101 Hudson Street
Jersey City, NJ 07032 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Massey & Gail LLP
The Wharf 1000 Maine Ave Suite 450
Washington, DC 20024 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Maune Raichle Hartley French & Mudd, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Joseph McGovern
1080 Kennedy Blvd Apt 24
Bayonne, NJ 07002 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Metals & Minerals Insurance Company Pte. Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Motley Rice LLC
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
N.V. Schadeverzekeringsmaatschappij Maas Lloyd
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh PA
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Nationwide Indemnity
PO Box 8102
Wausau, WI 54402 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
New Hampshire Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Otterbourg P.C
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Pacific Employers Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Parkins Lee & Rubio LLP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
RheinLand Versicherungen
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Rio Tinto America Holdings Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Rio Tinto America Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Rio Tinto Services Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Roger Frankel, as Legal Representative for Future Personal Injury Claimants appointed in the Chapter 11 bankruptcy case of Cyprus Mines Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ross Feller Casey LLP
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Ruckdeschel Law Firm, LLC
8357 Main Street
Ellicott City, MD 21043 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Scottsdale Insurance
Dan K. Myhrer PO Box 8102
Wausau, WI 54402 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Kirk Smith
322 Dallas Dr.
Toms River, NJ 08753 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Sue Sommer-Kresse
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Starr Indemnity & Liability Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
State of Texas
Assistant Attorney General PO Box 12548
Austin, TX 78711 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Steering Committee in the In re: Johnson & Johnson Talcum Powder Products Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Multi District Litigation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
TIG Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Talc Claimants
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
The Continental Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
The Insurance Company of the State of Pennsylvania
100 Jericho Quadrangle Suite 300
Jericho, NY 11753 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
The North River Insurance Company
20 West State Street PO Box 325
Trenton, NJ 08625 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
The Plaintiffs Steering Committee in the In re: Johnson & Johnson Talcum Powder Products Marketing, Sales Practices and Products Liability Multi-District Litigation
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Three Crowns Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Travelers Casualty and Surety Company (f/k/a The Aetna Casualty and Surety Company)
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Margaret Watson
|
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Weitz & Luxenberg P.C.
700 Broadway
New York, NY 10003 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Westchester Fire Insurance Company
1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036 |
Represented By
|
Interested Party
Williams Hart Boundas Easterby, LLP, on behalf of certain personal injury claimants (Williams Hart Plaintiffs)
|
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
AlixPartners, LLP
909 Third Avenue
New York, NY 10022 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Bates White, LLC
2001 K Street NW North Building, Suite 500
Washington, DC 20006 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC
777 Third Avenue 12th Floor
New York, NY 10017 |
Represented By
|
Other Prof.
FTI Consulting, Inc.
1166 Avenue of the Americas 14th Floor
New York, NY 10036 |
|
Other Prof.
Houlihan Lokey Capital, Inc.
245 Park Avenue 20th Floor
New York, NY 10167 |
|
Other Prof.
The Brattle Group, Inc.
7 Times Square Suite 1700
New York, NY 10036 |
|
Spec. Counsel
King & Spalding, LLP
1185 Avenue of the Americas 34th Floor
New York, NY 10036 |
|
Spec. Counsel
Massey & Gail LLP
1000 Maine Ave SW Suite 450
Washington, DC 20024 |
Represented By
|
Spec. Counsel
McCarter & English, LLP
Four Gateway Center 100 Mulberry Street
Newark, NJ 07102 |
Represented By
|
Spec. Counsel
Monzack Mersky and Bowder, P.A.
1201 N. Orange Street Suite 400
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
|
Spec. Counsel
Parkins Lee & Rubio LLP
700 Milam Street Suite 1300
Houston, TX 77002 |
Represented By
|
Spec. Counsel
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP
Patterson Belknap Webb & Tyler LLP 1133 Avenue of the Americas
New York, NY 10036 |
Represented By
|
Spec. Counsel
Shook, Hardy, & Bacon, LLP
JPMorgan Chase Tower 600 Travis Street Suite 3400
Houston, TX 77002 |
|
Spec. Counsel
Weil, Gotshal, & Manges, LLP
767 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10153 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Bankruptcy Administrator Office
402 W. Trade Street Suite 200
Charlotte, NC 28202 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102 |
Represented By
|
Unknown Role Type
Reuters News & Media, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Unknown Role Type
The Amici Professors
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Attorney
Heather W. Culp
Terminated: 12/02/2021
Essex Richards, PA 1701 South Boulevard 1701 South B
Charlotte, NC 28203 |
Represented By
|
Creditor
Blue Cross Blue Shield Association
Terminated: 02/01/2022
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago |