BONILLA et al v. BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. et al
New Jersey District Court | |
Judge: | Michael A Shipp |
Referred: | Lois H Goodman |
Case #: | 3:14-cv-05058 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Aug 12, 2014 |
Terminated: | Dec 15, 2014 |
Last checked: Friday May 08, 2015 10:30 AM EDT |
Defendant
BANK OF AMERICA HOME LOAN SERVICING, LP
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
HUDSON CITY SAVINGS BANK, FSB
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
IRIS BONILLA
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHN BONILLA
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 10 hours ago |
Monday, December 15, 2014 | ||
15 | 15
order
Order Dismissing Case
Mon 12/15 11:35 AM
CONSENT ORDER DISMISSING CASE. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 12/15/2014. (eaj) |
|
Friday, December 12, 2014 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Letter
Fri 12/12 2:54 PM
Letter from Christopher Portee.(PORTEE, CHRISTOPHER) |
|
Att: 1 Cover Letter | ||
Friday, November 14, 2014 | ||
13 | 13 LETTER ORDER adjourning the return date for the8 MOTION to Dismiss for 2 Motion Cycles. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 11/14/2014. (eaj) | |
Thursday, November 13, 2014 | ||
12 | 12 Letter from Christopher Portee. (PORTEE, CHRISTOPHER) | |
Thursday, November 06, 2014 | ||
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Letter Orders, #10 and #11 submitted by the Clerk's Office on 10/29/2014 appear to be duplicates. These submissions will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. This message is for informational purposes only. (dm ) | ||
Wednesday, October 29, 2014 | ||
11 | 11 LETTER ORDER that the Motion to Dismiss has been extended one motion cycle to 11/17/2014. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/29/2014. (jjc) | |
10 | 10 LETTER ORDER adjourning the return date for the8 MOTION to Dismiss until 11/17/2014. Signed by Judge Michael A. Shipp on 10/29/2014. (eaj) | |
RESET Deadlines as to8 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 11/17/2014 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj) | ||
Reset Deadlines as to8 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion reset for 11/17/2014 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (jjc) | ||
Tuesday, October 28, 2014 | ||
9 | 9 Letter from Christopher J. Portee. (PORTEE, CHRISTOPHER) | |
Wednesday, October 08, 2014 | ||
8 | 8 MOTION to Dismiss by BANK OF AMERICA HOME LOAN SERVICING, LP, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., HUDSON CITY SAVINGS BANK, FSB. Responses due by 10/20/2014(SAYDAH, HEATHER) | |
Att: 1 Brief, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Appendix Unpublished Cases, | ||
Att: 5 Text of Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 6 Certificate of Service | ||
Set Deadlines as to8 MOTION to Dismiss . Motion set for 11/3/2014 before Judge Michael A. Shipp. The motion will be decided on the papers. No appearances required unless notified by the court. (eaj) | ||
Friday, September 19, 2014 | ||
7 | 7 Application and Proposed Order for Clerk's Order to extend time to answer as to Defendants.. (SAYDAH, HEATHER) | |
6 | 6 Corporate Disclosure Statement by HUDSON CITY SAVINGS BANK, FSB identifying Hudson City Bancorp, Inc. as Corporate Parent.. (SAYDAH, HEATHER) | |
5 | 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by BANK OF AMERICA HOME LOAN SERVICING, LP, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. identifying Bank of America Corporation as Corporate Parent.. (SAYDAH, HEATHER) | |
4 | 4 NOTICE of Appearance by HEATHER ELIZABETH SAYDAH on behalf of BANK OF AMERICA HOME LOAN SERVICING, LP, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., HUDSON CITY SAVINGS BANK, FSB (SAYDAH, HEATHER) | |
3 | 3 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by BANK OF AMERICA HOME LOAN SERVICING, LP, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., HUDSON CITY SAVINGS BANK, FSB. (SAYDAH, HEATHER) | |
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order3 filed by Heather Saydah on 9/19/2014 was submitted incorrectly as a Motion. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order USING the event Application for Clerk Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order. This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (eaj) | ||
Clerk`s Text Order - The document7 Application for Clerk's Order to Ext Answer/Proposed Order submitted by BANK OF AMERICA HOME LOAN SERVICING, LP, HUDSON CITY SAVINGS BANK, FSB, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A. has been GRANTED. The answer due date has been set for 10/8/2014. (eaj) | ||
Wednesday, August 13, 2014 | ||
2 | 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to BANK OF AMERICA HOME LOAN SERVICING, LP, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., HUDSON CITY SAVINGS BANK, FSB Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. Issued By *Beth Joniak* (eaj) | |
Tuesday, August 12, 2014 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against BANK OF AMERICA HOME LOAN SERVICING, LP, BANK OF AMERICA, N.A., HUDSON CITY SAVINGS BANK, FSB ( Filing and Admin fee $ 400 receipt number TRE46720) with JURY DEMAND, filed by JOHN BONILLA, IRIS BONILLA.(eaj) | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Cover Letter |