Newman v. Cypress Environmental Mgmt
Original Case: 7:19-cv-00244
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcf-51089 |
Type | private civil federal / private |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Nov 16, 2021 |
Terminated: | Apr 14, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Apr 17, 2022 3:21 AM CDT |
Defendant
Plains All American Pipeline, L.P.
|
Represented By
|
Intervenor - Appellant
Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Kenneth Newman, Individually and on Behalf of All Others Similarly Situated
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Apr 14 2022
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-51089 Affirmed ] Judge: CES, Judge: EBC, Judge: JCH. Mandate issue date is 05/06/2022 [21-51089] |
Docket last updated: 04/17/2022 3:21 AM CDT |
Tuesday, November 16, 2021 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Cypress Environmental Management-TIR, L.L.C. 21-51089 (RSM) |