Texas Southern District Court
Judge:Lynn N Hughes
Case #: 4:14-cv-02330
Nature of Suit791 Labor - Employee Retirement Income Security Act
Cause29:1132 E.R.I.S.A.-Employee Benefits
Case Filed:Aug 13, 2014
Terminated:Oct 04, 2016
Last checked: Wednesday May 13, 2015 7:38 PM CDT
Conflict Check Party
Sonic Automotive, Inc.
Conflict Check Party
Sonic Automotive, Inc. Welfare Benefits Plan
Defendant
Sonic Automotive Employee Welfare Benefit Plan
Represented By
Stacy Wood
Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein
contact info
Debra Kleman
Parker Poe Adams & Bernstein
contact info
Donald William Gould, II
Johnson Deluca Et Al
contact info
Plaintiff
Oprex Surgery (Baytown), L.P.
Strasburger & Price 909 Fannin Suite 2300
Houston, TX 77010
Represented By
Jessica Marie Bresler
Strasburger And Price LLP
contact info
Charles Scott Nichols
Strasburger Price LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/25/2015 3:37 AM CST
Wednesday, August 13, 2014
1 1 COMPLAINT against Sonic Automotive Inc Employee Welfare Benefit Plan (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0541-13564634) filed by Oprex Surgery (Baytown), L.P..(Nichols, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet