Planned Parenthood v. City of Lubbock, Texas
Original Case: 5:21-cv-00114
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cr-11148 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 17, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jan 21, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Jan 24, 2022 2:23 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
City of Lubbock, Texas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services, on behalf of itself, its staff, physicians and patients
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
G. Sealy Massingill, M.D., on behalf of himself and his patients
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/24/2022 2:23 AM CST |
Wednesday, November 17, 2021 | ||
3 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Dr. G. Sealy Massingill, M.D. and Planned Parenthood of Greater Texas Surgical Health Services 21-11148 (MFY) |