Seneca Insurance v. RREAF Holdings
Original Case: 3:20-cv-00526
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcd-60879 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Case Filed: | Nov 17, 2021 |
Terminated: | Jun 03, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Jun 06, 2022 3:22 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
RREAF Holdings, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Bradford Byram, L.L.C.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Seneca Insurance Company, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/06/2022 3:22 AM CDT |
Wednesday, November 17, 2021 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Seneca Insurance Company, Incorporated. 21-60879 (DLJ) |