Ellis v. Clarksdale Public Utilities
Original Case: 4:20-cv-00032
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcf-60885 |
Type | private civil federal / private |
Nature of Suit | 290 Real Property - All Other Real Property |
Case Filed: | Nov 18, 2021 |
Terminated: | May 08, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday May 09, 2023 3:29 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Clarksdale Public Utilities
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Clarksdale Public Works
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
City of Clarksdale
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Bruce Ellis, doing business as Delta Cinema
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Willie Ellis, doing business as Delta Cinema
|
Represented By
|
GPO
May 08 2023
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-60885 Affirmed ] Judge: PEH , Judge: LHS , Judge: DRW. Mandate issue date is 05/30/2023 [21-60885] |
Docket last updated: 05/09/2023 3:29 AM CDT |
Thursday, November 18, 2021 | ||
4 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL FEDERAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. Bruce Ellis and Mr. Willie Ellis 21-60885 (MAS) |