Shipley v. Exelon
Original Case: 4:20-cv-02240
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcd-20602 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Nov 18, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 31, 2022 |
Last checked: Friday Apr 01, 2022 3:28 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
Exelon Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Exelon Generation Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Hubert Shipley
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/01/2022 3:28 AM CDT |
Thursday, November 18, 2021 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Hubert Shipley 21-20602 (ABT) |