USA v. Yrdanoff
Original Case: 4:17-cr-00193
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-ncrim-11153 |
Type | criminal (ncrim) / post-conviction |
Case Filed: | Nov 19, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 28, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jan 04, 2022 8:53 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellant
Scott Allen Yrdanoff
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/04/2022 8:53 AM CST |
Friday, November 19, 2021 | ||
3 pgs NON-DIRECT CRIMINAL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Scott Allen Yrdanoff 21-11153 (RSM) |