Macias v. Salazar
Original Case: 5:21-cv-00193
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cr-51127 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 19, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 02, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 03, 2022 3:33 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellant
Sheriff Javier Salazar
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellant
Laura Balditt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Steven Macias, Heirs of Fernando Macias and Representative of the Estate of Fernando Macias
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Yvonne Shilling, Heirs of Fernando Macias and Representative of the Estate of Fernando Macias
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellee
Walter Macias, Heirs of Fernando Macias and Representative of the Estate of Fernando Macias
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Aug 02 2022
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-51127 Reversed and Rendered] Judge: CES , Judge: JWE , Judge: JEG. Mandate issue date is 08/24/2022 [21-51127] |
Docket last updated: 08/03/2022 3:33 AM CDT |
Friday, November 19, 2021 | ||
3 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Ms. Laura Balditt and Mr. Javier Salazar 21-51127 (MVM) |