Sambrano v. United Airlines
Original Case: 4:21-cv-01074
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cr-11159 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Nov 22, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 17, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Feb 19, 2022 2:25 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
United Airlines, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
David Sambrano, on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
David Castillo, on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Kimberly Hamilton, on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Debra Jennefer Thal Jonas, on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Genise Kincannon, on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Seth Turnbough, on their own behalf and on behalf of all others similarly situated
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Feb 17 2022
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-11159 Reversed and Remanded ] Judge: JES , Judge: JWE , Judge: ASO. Mandate issue date is 03/11/2022 [21-11159] |
Docket last updated: 02/19/2022 2:25 AM CST |
Monday, November 22, 2021 | ||
3 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants Mr. David Castillo, Ms. Kimberly Hamilton, Ms. Debra Jennefer Thal Jonas, Ms. Genise Kincannon, Mr. David Sambrano and Mr. Seth Turnbough 21-11159 (LEF) | ||
5 pgs INITIAL CASE CHECK by Attorney Advisor complete. Action: Case OK to Process. [9717757-2] Initial AA Check Due satisfied.. Transcript order due on 12/07/2021 for Appellants David Castillo, Kimberly Hamilton, Debra Jennefer Thal Jonas, Genise Kincannon, David Sambrano and Seth Turnbough 21-11159 (LEF) |