Scott v. Wollney
Original Case: 3:20-cv-02825
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-pcd-11161 |
Type | private civil diversity / private |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Case Filed: | Nov 22, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 02, 2022 |
Last checked: Monday Sep 05, 2022 3:30 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
Scott D. Wollney
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
Joseph R. Shugrue
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
Paul A. Romano
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee/Cross-Appellant
Atlas Financial Holdings, Incorporated, Individually, doing business as Atlas Group of Companies, doing business as American Insurance Acquisition, Inc., doing business as American Service Insurance Company, doing business as American Country Insurance, do
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant/Cross-Appellee
Gregory Alan Scott, doing business as Scott Law Firm
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Sep 02 2022
UNPUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-11161 Affirmed] Judge: EHJ, Judge: JCH, Judge: CTW. Mandate issue date is 09/26/2022 [21-11161] |
Docket last updated: 09/05/2022 3:30 AM CDT |
Monday, November 22, 2021 | ||
2 pgs PRIVATE CIVIL DIVERSITY CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Gregory Alan Scott 21-11161 (MFY) | ||
2 pgs CASE CAPTION updated. Cross appeal filed. [9718293-2] Parties updated: Appellant/Cross-Appellee Gregory Alan Scott, Appellees/Cross-Appellants Scott D. Wollney, Joseph R. Shugrue, Paul A. Romano and Atlas Financial Holdings, Inc. in 21-11161 NOA filed by Appellees Atlas Financial Holdings, Inc., Paul A. Romano, Mr. Joseph R. Shugrue and Mr. Scott D. Wollney. [9718293-1] 21-11161 (CBW) |