Harrison County, MS v. U.S. Army Corps
Original Case: 1:19-cv-00986
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-usc-60897 |
Type | united states civil / united states |
Nature of Suit | 893 Other Statutes - Environmental Matters |
Case Filed: | Nov 23, 2021 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 28, 2023 3:31 AM CDT |
Defendant - Appellee
United States Army Corps of Engineers
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Harrison County, Mississippi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Hancock County, Mississippi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
City of Biloxi, Mississippi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
City of D'Iberville, Mississippi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
City of Waveland, Mississippi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Mississippi Hotel and Lodging Association
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Mississippi Commercial Fisheries United, Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
City of Pass Christian, Mississippi
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
City of Diamondhead, Mississippi
|
Represented By
|
GPO
Mar 27 2023
PUBLISHED OPINION FILED. [21-60897 Affirmed ] Judge: PR , Judge: JCH , Judge: KDE Mandate issue date is 05/19/2023 [21-60897] |
Docket last updated: 03/28/2023 3:31 AM CDT |
Tuesday, November 23, 2021 | ||
2 pgs US CIVIL CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellants City of Biloxi, Mississippi, City of D'Iberville, Mississippi, City of Diamondhead, Mississippi, City of Pass Christian, Mississippi, City of Waveland, Mississippi, Hancock County, Mississippi, Harrison County, Mississippi, Mississippi Commercial Fisheries United, Incorporated and Mississippi Hotel and Lodging Association. 21-60897 (SEP) |