Burns v. Weiland
Original Case: 3:19-cv-00338
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cr-40872 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Nov 23, 2021 |
Terminated: | Dec 27, 2021 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 28, 2021 2:23 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
Sergeant James Weiland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Brian Tandy
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Damon Burns
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12/28/2021 2:23 AM CST |
Tuesday, November 23, 2021 | ||
2 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Mr. Damon Burns 21-40872 (ABT) |