Daniels v. Georgia Pacific
Original Case: 9:21-cv-00031
Fifth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:21-cr-40867 |
Type | civil rights / private |
Nature of Suit | 442 Civil Rights - Employment |
Case Filed: | Nov 23, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 01, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Feb 02, 2022 2:27 AM CST |
Defendant - Appellee
Georgia Pacific Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Betty Jean Daniels
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 02/02/2022 2:27 AM CST |
Tuesday, November 23, 2021 | ||
3 pgs CIVIL RIGHTS CASE docketed. NOA filed by Appellant Ms. Betty Jean Daniels 21-40867 (ABT) |