Ohio Security Insurance Company et al v. Khoury Brothers, LLC et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Michael R Barrett |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-00761 |
Nature of Suit | 110 Contract - Insurance |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgment (Insurance) |
Case Filed: | Dec 07, 2021 |
Terminated: | Sep 30, 2022 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 05, 2022 4:41 AM EDT |
Defendant
Megan Brown
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Khoury Brothers, LLC
7454 Beechmont Ave
Cincinnati, OH 45255 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ohio Security Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Friday, September 30, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Fri 09/30 10:15 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Plaintiffs Ohio Security Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Harter, William) |
|
utility
Terminate Civil Case
Fri 09/30 12:53 PM
***Civil Case Terminated per doc17 . (kh) |
||
Friday, May 27, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 05/27 2:43 PM
ORDER - Upon Motion and for good cause shown, Plaintiffs Ohio Security Insurance Company and the Ohio Casualty Company are granted an extension up to and including May 27, 2022 to file their Reply in Support of their Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 05/27/2022. (bjc) |
|
utility
Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 05/27 2:44 PM
Reset Deadlines as to9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings . Replies due by 5/27/2022 per Doc.16 . (bjc) |
||
Thursday, May 26, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
respm
Reply to Response to Motion
Thu 05/26 3:23 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Plaintiffs Ohio Security Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Harter, William) |
|
Friday, May 20, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time
Fri 05/20 1:56 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time New date requested 5/27/2022. Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Plaintiffs Ohio Security Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Madigan, Kaitlin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
Tuesday, May 17, 2022 | ||
minutes
Status Conference
Tue 05/17 2:34 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Michael R. Barrett: Status Conference held on 5/17/2022; Kaitlin Nakajima appeared for plaintiffs; Gus Janszen appeared for defendant; case to proceed as discussed. (kkz) |
||
Monday, May 16, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 05/16 5:07 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Defendant Khoury Brothers, LLC. (Janszen, August) |
|
Friday, May 06, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 05/06 3:33 PM
Notation Order: This matter is before the Court on12 Defendants' MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. For good cause shown, and the reasons stated therein, it is hereby ORDERED that12 Defendants' MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply is GRANTED, and they shall have up to and including 5/16/2022 to file their response to9 Plaintiffs' MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 5/6/2022. (kkz) |
||
Monday, May 02, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 05/02 7:45 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to9 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings New date requested 5/16/2022. by Defendant Khoury Brothers, LLC. (Janszen, August) |
|
Friday, April 29, 2022 | ||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Fri 04/29 8:25 AM
Set Deadlines/Hearings: Amended Pleadings due by 7/15/2022. (kkz) |
||
Thursday, April 28, 2022 | ||
11 | 11
order
Cincinnati Preliminary Pretrial Order
Thu 04/28 12:26 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Status Conference is set for 5/17/2022 at 11:00 AM by Teleconference before Judge Michael R. Barrett; Disclosure of Non-Expert (Fact) Witness due by 6/15/2022; Motions directed to pleadings due by 7/15/2022; Plaintiff Primary Expert due by 1/16/2023; Defendant Primary Expert due by 2/16/2023; Rebuttal Expert due by 3/16/2023; Discovery due by 4/28/2023; Dispositive motions due by 5/30/2023; Settlement Conference is set for 7/11/2023 at 1:30 PM in Chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett; Final Pretrial Conference is set for 10/30/2023 at 11:00 AM in Chambers before Judge Michael R. Barrett; Jury Trial set for 01/2024 before Judge Michael R. Barrett in Room 109. Signed by Judge Michael R. Barrett on 4/28/2022. (kkz) |
|
Friday, April 15, 2022 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Rule 26(f) Report
Fri 04/15 2:42 PM
RULE 26(f) REPORT by Plaintiffs Ohio Security Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Harter, William) |
|
Monday, April 11, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Judgment on the Pleadings
Mon 04/11 3:00 PM
MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Plaintiffs Ohio Security Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Harter, William) |
|
Wednesday, March 16, 2022 | ||
notice
Notice of Deadline
Wed 03/16 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Deadline: Rule 26(f) Report due by 4/15/2022. Please visit www.ohsd.uscourts.gov/FPbarrett to obtain copies of the Court's required Rule 26(f) report and joint final pretrial order forms as well as its trial procedures. (kkz) |
||
Tuesday, March 15, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Tue 03/15 11:51 AM
Defendant, Megan Brown's ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Megan Brown. (Nakajima, Wesley) |
|
Friday, March 11, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 03/11 2:48 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, filed by Khoury Brothers, LLC. (Janszen, August) |
|
Thursday, February 17, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Thu 02/17 11:18 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD by Defendant Khoury Brothers, LLC. (Janszen, August) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 02/17 1:57 PM
Reset Deadlines: Khoury Brothers, LLC answer due 3/11/2022 per Doc.6 . (bjc) |
||
Monday, January 31, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 01/31 1:30 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Megan Brown on 12/7/2021, answer due 2/7/2022. (Harter, William) |
|
Monday, January 10, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Mon 01/10 3:46 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Khoury Brothers, LLC on 12/21/2021, answer due 2/22/2022. (Madigan, Kaitlin) |
|
Tuesday, December 07, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 12/07 1:38 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Harter, William) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 12/07 1:33 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Plaintiff Ohio Security Insurance Company. (Harter, William) |
|
1 | 1
16
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 12/07 1:11 PM
COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Khoury Brothers, LLC dba Latitude, Megan Brown ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8625531), filed by Ohio Security Insurance Company, The Ohio Casualty Insurance Company. (Harter, William) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit C | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 12/07 4:11 PM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kh) |