EASTMAN v. THOMPSON et al
District Of Columbia District Court | |
Judge: | Carl J Nichols |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-03273 |
Nature of Suit | 890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | Dec 14, 2021 |
Last checked: Sunday Jun 12, 2022 5:31 AM EDT |
Defendant
SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
BENNIE G. THOMPSON
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
TIMOTHY J. HEAPHY
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
JOHN WOOD
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
JOHN C. EASTMAN
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/17/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, June 28, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
misc
Stipulation of Dismissal
Tue 06/28 9:47 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by JOHN C. EASTMAN. (Burnham, Charles) |
|
Tuesday, June 21, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Sealed Order
Tue 06/21 5:01 PM
SEALED ORDER (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.) Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on 6/21/2022. (zkh) |
|
20 | 20
motion
Extension of Time to
Tue 06/21 1:04 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to by JOHN C. EASTMAN.(Burnham, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines
Tue 06/21 5:02 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the20 Motion for Extension of Time, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's response to Defendants'18 Motion to Dismiss is due June 28, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on June 21, 2022. (lccjn1) |
||
Saturday, June 04, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
motion
Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal
Sat 06/04 6:16 PM
SEALED MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE DOCUMENT UNDER SEAL filed by JOHN C. EASTMAN (This document is SEALED and only available to authorized persons.)(Burnham, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Proposed Sealed Filing, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Monday, May 23, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Dismiss
Mon 05/23 10:05 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by TIMOTHY J. HEAPHY, SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL, BENNIE G. THOMPSON, JOHN WOOD.(Letter, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Wednesday, April 27, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines
Wed 04/27 3:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of the Congressional Defendants'14 Motion to Extend Time to Respond, it is ORDERED that the Motion is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Congressional Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to May 23, 2022. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on April 27, 2022. (lccjn1) |
||
Monday, April 25, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 04/25 1:37 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC..(Figel, Reid) |
|
16 | 16
notice
LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests
Mon 04/25 1:32 PM
LCvR 26.1 CERTIFICATE OF DISCLOSURE of Corporate Affiliations and Financial Interests by VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC. (Figel, Reid) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/25 1:29 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Reid Mason Figel on behalf of VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC. (Figel, Reid) |
|
Monday, April 18, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
motion
Extension of Time to
Mon 04/18 6:43 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint by TIMOTHY J. HEAPHY, SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL, BENNIE G. THOMPSON, JOHN WOOD.(Letter, Douglas) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 04/18 6:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Douglas N. Letter on behalf of TIMOTHY J. HEAPHY, SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL, BENNIE G. THOMPSON, JOHN WOOD (Letter, Douglas) |
|
Tuesday, March 15, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Tue 03/15 12:37 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. JOHN WOOD served on 3/14/2022, answer due 4/4/2022 (Burnham, Charles) |
|
11 | 11
service
Summons Returned as to private individual or business
Tue 03/15 12:36 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. TIMOTHY J. HEAPHY served on 3/14/2022, answer due 4/4/2022; SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL served on 3/14/2022, answer due 4/4/2022; BENNIE G. THOMPSON served on 3/14/2022, answer due 4/4/2022 (Burnham, Charles) |
|
10 | 10
service
Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General
Tue 03/15 12:03 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 3/14/22.(Burnham, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
Monday, March 14, 2022 | ||
9 | 9
service
Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney
Tue 03/15 12:01 AM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 2/22/2022. Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 4/23/2022.(Burnham, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit | ||
Tuesday, March 01, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
service
Waiver of Service
Tue 03/01 9:18 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE. VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC. waiver sent on 2/22/2022, answer due 4/23/2022. (Burnham, Charles) |
|
Monday, January 10, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
order
.Order
Mon 01/10 4:33 PM
STANDING ORDER. Signed by Judge Carl J. Nichols on January 10, 2022. (lccjn3) |
|
Wednesday, December 22, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
service
Electronic Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG
Wed 12/22 1:38 PM
SUMMONS (7) Issued Electronically as to TIMOTHY J. HEAPHY, SELECT COMMITTEE TO INVESTIGATE THE JANUARY 6TH ATTACK ON THE UNITED STATES CAPITOL, BENNIE G. THOMPSON, VERIZON COMMUNICATIONS, INC., JOHN WOOD, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General(adh, ) |
|
Att: 1 Notice and Consent | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Wed 12/22 11:39 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Carl J. Nichols. (zsb) |
||
Tuesday, December 21, 2021 | ||
5 | 5
4
pgs
misc
Response to Order to Show Cause
Tue 12/21 5:48 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by JOHN C. EASTMAN re Order to Show Cause, filed by JOHN C. EASTMAN. (Burnham, Charles) |
|
4 | 4
cmp
Civil Cover Sheet (USE ONLY IF INSTRUCTED)
Tue 12/21 4:27 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET amended by JOHN C. EASTMAN filed by JOHN C. EASTMAN.(Burnham, Charles) |
|
order
Order to Show Cause
Tue 12/21 3:01 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff is hereby ordered to show cause, on or before December 28, 2021, why this case should not be dismissed given Plaintiff's failure to remedy the errors that the Clerk's Office identified with his filing and asked Plaintiff to correct on December 15 and 20, 2021. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 12/21/2021. (lccrc3) |
||
Monday, December 20, 2021 | ||
notice
Notice of QC- New Case
Mon 12/20 4:04 PM
NOTICE OF ERROR re1 Complaint; emailed to charles@burnhamgorokhov.com, cc'd 3 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Blank or missing coversheet. Please use the cover sheet at https://www.dcd.uscourts.gov/new-case-forms & file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 2. Case Assignment and Nature of Suit was not selected on the Civil Cover Sheet (section IV). Please re-file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (zsb, ) |
||
Friday, December 17, 2021 | ||
3 | 3
cmp
Request for Summons to Issue
Fri 12/17 10:08 AM
REQUEST FOR SUMMONS TO ISSUE Bennie Thompson filed by JOHN C. EASTMAN.(Burnham, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Summons Attorney General, | ||
Att: 2 Summons Timothy Heaphy, | ||
Att: 3 Summons Select Committee, | ||
Att: 4 Summons U.S. Attorney (D.C.), | ||
Att: 5 Summons Verizon, | ||
Att: 6 Summons John Wood | ||
2 | 2
1
pgs
notice
Notice of Related Case
Fri 12/17 10:02 AM
NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by All Plaintiffs. Case related to Case No. 21-cv-3217. (Burnham, Charles) |
|
Wednesday, December 15, 2021 | ||
notice
Notice of QC- New Case
Wed 12/15 11:04 AM
NOTICE OF ERROR re1 Complaint; emailed to charles@burnhamgorokhov.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Missing summonses-government. When naming a government agent or agency as a defendant, you must supply a summons for each defendant & two additional summonses for the U.S. Attorney & U.S. Attorney General. Please submit using the event Request for Summons to Issue., 2. Case Assignment and Nature of Suit was not selected on the Civil Cover Sheet (section IV). Please re-file using the event Civil Cover Sheet., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, ) |
||
notice
Notice of QC- New Case
Wed 12/15 11:05 AM
NOTICE OF ERROR re1 Complaint; emailed to charles@burnhamgorokhov.com, cc'd 0 associated attorneys -- The PDF file you docketed contained errors: 1. Pleading filed as attachment. Please file pleading as separate entry., 2. Please submit using the event Notice of Related Case., 3. COMPLIANCE DEADLINE is by close of business today. This case will not proceed any further until all errors are satisfied. (znmg, ) |
||
Tuesday, December 14, 2021 | ||
1 | 1
21
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Tue 12/14 5:50 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number ADCDC-8929254) filed by JOHN C. EASTMAN.(Burnham, Charles) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Subpoena, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Schedule, | ||
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 4 Related Case Form, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit House Resolution |