Davis v. Henkel Corporation, et al
Ohio Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Timothy S Black |
Case #: | 1:21-cv-00782 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Dec 16, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 02, 2022 |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 14, 2022 5:06 AM EDT |
Defendant
Henkel Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Thriving Brands LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Brad A. Davis
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Thursday, February 03, 2022 | ||
utility
Remark
Thu 02/03 11:13 AM
***Case transferred from Ohio Southern has been opened in District of Connecticut as case 3:22-cv-00196, filed 02/02/2022. (er) |
||
Wednesday, February 02, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
4
pgs
order
Order
Wed 02/02 3:05 PM
ORDER GRANTING TRANSFER - the parties request, via stipulation (Doc.6 ), totransfer this case to the District of Connecticut is GRANTED. This case is hereby TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the District of Connecticut, and the Clerk shall act accordingly. Signed by Judge Timothy S. Black on 02/02/2022. (bjc) |
|
transfer
Case Transferred Out - District
Wed 02/02 3:08 PM
Case transferred to District of Connecticut. Case file and docket sheet sent Electronically. (bjc) |
||
Tuesday, February 01, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
misc
Stipulation
Tue 02/01 4:20 PM
STIPULATION Joint Stipulation to Transfer Action to District of Connecticut by Plaintiff Brad A. Davis. (Braun, Joseph) |
|
5 | 5
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 02/01 4:18 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Thriving Brands LLC on 1/27/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (Braun, Joseph) |
|
4 | 4
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 02/01 4:17 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed. Waiver sent to Henkel Corporation on 1/27/2022, answer due 3/28/2022. (Braun, Joseph) |
|
Thursday, January 06, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 01/06 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Stuart Wayne for Plaintiff Brad A. Davis (Wayne, Richard) |
|
Friday, December 17, 2021 | ||
misc
Docket Annotation
Fri 12/17 11:12 AM
If this case is referred, it will be to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Litkovitz. (kl) |
||
Thursday, December 16, 2021 | ||
2 | 2
notice
Notice of Appearance
Thu 12/16 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Richard Stuart Wayne for Plaintiff BRAD A DAVIS (Wayne, Richard) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Thu 12/16 2:57 PM
COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against HENKEL CORPORATION, THRIVING BRANDS LLC ( Filing fee $ 402 paid - receipt number: AOHSDC-8641707), filed by BRAD A DAVIS. (Braun, Joseph) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet |