Concannon v. LEGO Systems, Inc. and LEGO System A/S
Connecticut District Court | |
Judge: | Omar A Williams |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-01678 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Dec 17, 2021 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 15, 2022 4:59 AM EDT |
Defendant
Lego Systems Inc
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James Concannon
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Lego A/S
Terminated: 06/13/2022
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Monday, March 04, 2024 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 03/04 4:04 PM
ORDER granting ECF No.86 , Motion for Extension of Time. All discovery shall be completed on or before October 4, 2024, and all interim discovery deadlines hereby are incorporated by reference. All interim discovery deadlines may be amended by agreement of the parties without the court's approval provided those amendments do not delay the deadline for completion of all discovery. Any motions for summary judgment shall be filed on or before November 8, 2024. The parties' joint trial memorandum shall be filed on or before December 9, 2024, if no dispositive motions are filed, or within the period set by the court upon its disposition of any dispositive motions that are filed. The court thereafter will set a jury selection date, and the parties should be prepared to proceed to trial on March 3, 2025. It is so ordered. Signed by Judge Omar A. Williams on 3/4/24. (Wagner, R) |
||
utility
Set Deadlines/Hearings
Wed 03/06 9:40 AM
Set Deadlines: Discovery due by 10/4/2024; Dispositive Motions due by 11/8/2024; Joint Trial Memorandum due by 12/9/2024; Trial Ready Date 3/3/2025. (Velez, F) |
||
Thursday, February 29, 2024 | ||
86 | 86
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 02/29 12:31 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to extend deadline to complete fact discovery by 60 days, and to extend all subsequent case deadlines by 60 days 85 Order on Motion for Extension of Time,,, by Lego System A/S, Lego Systems Inc. (Ferriter Russo, Emily) |