California Northern District Court
Judge:Thomas S Hixson
Case #: 3:21-cv-09747
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Dec 17, 2021
Terminated:Mar 06, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Jun 15, 2022 2:01 AM PDT
Defendant
Unilodgers, Inc.
Represented By
Gabriel G. Gregg
Rimon, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Vaibhav Verma
Represented By
Gabriel G. Gregg
Rimon, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Shipra Jain
Represented By
Stephanie A. Le
King And Spalding LLP
contact info
Kenneth D. Beale
King & Spalding
contact info
Kinh Luan Tran
King & Spalding LLP
contact info

GPO Jun 08 2022
ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting in part and denying in part 26 Motion to Dismiss. (tshlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 6/8/2022)
GPO Apr 13 2023
ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting in part and denying in part 47 Motion to Dismiss. Amended Pleadings due by 5/12/2023. (tshlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/13/2023)
GPO Jan 31 2024
ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson re 72 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed; 73 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed. In ECF No. 84, Defendants state that they do not seek sealing of any portion of ECF Nos. 72 and 73. Accordingly, the Court ORDERS that ECF Nos. 72 and 73 shall be UNSEALED in their entirety. Plaintiff shall file the documents contained in ECF. Nos. 72 and 73 on the public docket no later than February 7, 2024. (tshlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 1/31/2024)
GPO Feb 06 2024
CF No. 81 in the public record. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/6/2024)ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson re 81 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal, 84 Administrative Motion to File Under Seal. The Court ORDERS Defendants to implement their proposed redactions on ECF No. 81 and file a redacted version of E
GPO Feb 07 2024
ORDER by Judge Thomas S. Hixson granting 74 Motion for TRO. Preliminary Injunction Hearing set for 2/15/2024 11:00 AM. The Court GRANTS Plaintiffs Motion for Temporary Restraining Order. This Temporary Restraining Order shall remain in effect until for a period of 14 days, through February 21, 2024, or further order of this Court. This order shall expire at 5:00 pm on February 21, 2024 unless the Court orders an extension. Defendants are ORDERED TO SHOW CAUSE why a preliminary injunction should not issue. Defendants shall file any response to this Order to Show Cause on or before noon Pacific time on February 12, 2024. Plaintiff shall file any reply on or before noon Pacific time February 14, 2024. Page limits and any affidavits or declarations shall be in compliance with Civil Local Rule 7. The Court sets a hearing on the Order to Show Cause for February 15, 2024, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom E, 15th floor, 450 Golden Gate Avenue, San Francisco, California 94102. Any party may file a request to appear by telephone. (tshlc2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 2/7/2024)
GPO Apr 02 2024
PUBLIC VERSION OF 103 ORDER denying 74 Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Shipra Jain. Signed by Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 4/2/2024. (tshlc1, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 4/2/2024)
GPO May 15 2024
STIPULATION AND ORDER re 122 Stipulation, filed by Shipra Jain. Signed by Magistrate Judge Thomas S. Hixson on 5/15/2024. (rmm2, COURT STAFF) (Filed on 5/15/2024)

Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, March 06, 2025
139 139 notice Notice (Other) Thu 03/06 12:46 PM
NOTICE by Vaibhav Verma, Unilodgers, Inc. Joint Notice of Settlement and Stipulation of Dismissal of Entire Case (Gregg, Gabriel)
Related: [-]