Amin v. United Financial Casualty Company et al
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | A Joe Fish |
Case #: | 3:21-cv-03239 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship) |
Case Filed: | Dec 30, 2021 |
Terminated: | Feb 22, 2023 |
Case in other court: | County Court at Law No 1 Dallas County, Texas, CC-21-05151-A |
Last checked: Tuesday Jun 28, 2022 3:31 AM CDT |
Defendant
United Financial Casualty Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Anas Amin
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, February 22, 2023 | ||
36 | 36
misc
Stipulation
Wed 02/22 2:30 PM
Joint STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL by United Financial Casualty Company. (Abarado, Anne-Marie) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
utility
Terminate Civil Case (Optional)
Wed 02/22 10:17 PM
Civil Case Terminated per36 Stipulation of Dismissal. (axm) |
||
Friday, January 06, 2023 | ||
order
Order
Fri 01/06 2:16 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: The court has been advised that this case has been settled. It is ORDERED that the final judgment or order of dismissal be presented for entry by February 21, 2023. If it is not, then the case will be subject to dismissal. The Clerk of Court is directed to terminate all pending motions, hearings, and deadlines. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/6/2023) (chmb) |
||
Thursday, January 05, 2023 | ||
34 | 34
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 01/06 11:00 AM
ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez for mediation. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/5/2023) (ndt) |
|
33 | 33
adr
Designation of Mediator
Thu 01/05 1:27 PM
Designation of Mediator by United Financial Casualty Company. (Abarado, Anne-Marie) |
|
Thursday, December 29, 2022 | ||
32 | 32
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Quash
Thu 12/29 2:41 PM
ORDER denying25 United Financial Casualty Company's Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to Take the Videotaped Oral Deposition of Defendant United Financial Casualty Company's Corporate Representative and Request for Documents. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 12/29/2022) (mcrd) |
|
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 12/29 2:31 PM
ELECTRONIC Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez: Hearing held on 12/29/2022 re:25 United Financial Casualty Company's Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to Take the Videotaped Oral Deposition of Defendant United Financial Casualty Company's Corporate Representative and Request for Documents. Attorney Appearances: Plaintiff - Barrett Robin; Defense - Mark Lapidus. (No exhibits)(Court Reporter Digital File.) (mcrd) |
||
Wednesday, December 21, 2022 | ||
30 | 30
3
pgs
order
Order
Wed 12/21 10:41 AM
Agreed Order re:25 United Financial Casualty Company's Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to Take the Videotaped Oral Deposition of Defendant United Financial Casualty Company's Corporate Representative and Request for Documents. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 12/21/2022) (mcrd) |
|
Tuesday, December 20, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
respm
Response/Objection
Tue 12/20 4:23 PM
RESPONSE filed by United Financial Casualty Company re:25 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to Take the Videotaped Oral Deposition of Defendant's Corporate Representative and Request for Documents (Abarado, Anne-Marie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Tue 12/20 5:01 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER re:25 United Financial Casualty Company's Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to Take the Videotaped Oral Deposition of Defendant United Financial Casualty Company's Corporate Representative and Request for Documents. An oral argument has been scheduled for 12/29/2022 02:00 PM in US Courthouse, Courtroom 1566, 1100 Commerce St., Dallas, TX 75242-1310 before Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. Unless otherwise ordered, the motion will be determined based on the relevant filings. No evidence will be received at the oral argument. Counsel must confirm their attendance at least two days prior to the hearing by contacting Courtroom Deputy Marie Gonzales at Marie_Gonzales@txnd.uscourts.gov. Failure to confirm or to attend the hearing without obtaining permission of the Court will result in appropriate sanctions. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 12/20/2022) (mcrd) |
||
Tuesday, December 06, 2022 | ||
27 | 27
6
pgs
order
Order Setting Deadline/Hearing
Tue 12/06 3:56 PM
ORDER re:25 United Financial Casualty Company's Motion to Quash Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to Take the Videotaped Oral Deposition of Defendant United Financial Casualty Company's Corporate Representative and Request for Documents. Based on the motion and the requested relief, it appears that neither party will be unduly harmed or prejudiced if the discovery that is the subject of the motion is stayed pending briefing and consideration of the motion, and it is hereby STAYED pending further order. Counsel for the parties to the dispute are hereby ORDERED to meet face-to-face to fully confer. Agreed proposed order or joint submission due by 12/20/2022. (Ordered by Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez on 12/6/2022) (mcrd) |
|
Monday, December 05, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
1
pgs
order
Order Referring Motion
Tue 12/06 12:25 PM
Order of Reference re:25 MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to Take the Videotaped Oral Deposition of Defendant's Corporate Representative and Request for Documents . Motion(s) referred to Magistrate Judge Irma Carrillo Ramirez. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 12/5/2022) (ndt) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Quash
Mon 12/05 3:28 PM
MOTION to Quash Plaintiff's Notice of Intent to Take the Videotaped Oral Deposition of Defendant's Corporate Representative and Request for Documents filed by United Financial Casualty Company (Abarado, Anne-Marie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) | ||
Tuesday, November 29, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
order
Judgment ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties
Tue 11/29 3:13 PM
JUDGMENT: This judgment is entered pursuant to FED. R. CIV. P. 58 and the order of this date. For the reasons stated in that order, it is ORDERED that the plaintiff take nothing from the defendant Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company ("Progressive") on her claims in this case, and that the Progressive recover its costs of court. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 11/29/2022) (oyh) |
|
23 | 23
3
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Summary Judgment
Tue 11/29 3:09 PM
ORDER granting18 Motion for Summary Judgment. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 11/29/2022) (oyh) |
|
Monday, November 28, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
respm
Reply
Mon 11/28 3:15 PM
REPLY filed by Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company re:18 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Abarado, Anne-Marie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) | ||
Monday, November 14, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
respm
Brief/Memorandum In Support
Mon 11/14 8:23 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support filed by Anas Amin re20 Response/Objection to Defendant Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company's Motion for Summary Judgment (Robin, Barrett) |
|
20 | 20
respm
Response/Objection
Mon 11/14 8:21 PM
RESPONSE filed by Anas Amin re:18 MOTION for Summary Judgment (Robin, Barrett) |
|
19 | 19
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Mon 11/14 8:20 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Barrett Thomas Robin on behalf of Anas Amin. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Robin, Barrett) |
|
Monday, October 24, 2022 | ||
18 | 18
motion
Summary Judgment
Mon 10/24 2:24 PM
MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company (Abarado, Anne-Marie) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) | ||
Tuesday, August 02, 2022 | ||
17 | 17
3
pgs
order
Order For ADR
Tue 08/02 11:52 AM
MEDIATION ORDER. The court appoints J Neal Prevost as mediator.[LINK:Alternative Dispute Resolution Summary] form provided electronically or by US Mail as appropriate. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 8/2/2022) (ygl) |
|
Friday, February 11, 2022 | ||
16 | 16
10
pgs
order
Order for Scheduling Order Proposal
Fri 02/11 3:33 PM
ORDER ESTABLISHING SCHEDULE AND CERTAIN PRETRIAL REQUIREMENTS: Amended Pleadings due by 5/9/2022. Discovery due by 9/26/2022. Joinder of Parties due by 5/9/2022. Motions due by 11/1/2022. Pretrial Materials due by 1/27/2023. Pretrial Order due by 1/27/2023. This case is set for trial on this court's four-week docket beginning 2/6/2023 before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. Pretrial Conference set for 2/3/2023 10:30 AM before Senior Judge A. Joe Fish. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 2/11/2022) (ndt) |
|
Thursday, February 10, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
misc
Status Report
Thu 02/10 5:43 PM
Joint STATUS REPORT filed by Anas Amin. (Brown, Scott) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) A | ||
Thursday, January 20, 2022 | ||
14 | 14
order
Status Report Order
Thu 01/20 4:21 PM
STATUS REPORT ORDER: Joint Status Report due by 2/10/2022. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/20/2022) (jmg) |
|
13 | 13
misc
Amended Document
Thu 01/20 2:56 PM
AMENDED DOCUMENT by Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, United Financial Casualty Company. Amendment to1 Notice of Removal,,,,. . (Lapidus, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 6 Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 7 Cover Sheet Supplement, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit(s) | ||
12 | 12
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/20 2:27 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by United Financial Casualty Company identifying Corporate Parent/Other Affiliate Progressive Commercial Holdings, Inc. for United Financial Casualty Company. (Lapidus, Mark) |
|
11 | 11
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/20 2:25 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company. (Lapidus, Mark) |
|
10 | 10
misc
Certificate Of Interested Persons/Disclosure Statement
Thu 01/20 2:14 PM
CERTIFICATE OF INTERESTED PERSONS/DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Anas Amin. (Brown, Scott) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Attorney Appearance
Thu 01/20 1:37 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Mark Ross Lapidus on behalf of Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company, United Financial Casualty Company. (Filer confirms contact info in ECF is current.) (Lapidus, Mark) |
|
Saturday, January 15, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Substitute Attorney
Tue 01/18 9:59 AM
ORDER granting7 Motion to Substitute Attorney. It is therefore ORDERED that Catherine Schneider and Laura Andrade are withdrawn as counsel of record for the plaintiff, and Scott Brown is substituted as counsel of record for the plaintiff. Christopher S. Hamilton and Ray T. Khirallah, Jr., shall remain as counsel of record for the plaintiff. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 1/15/2022) (ykp) |
|
Friday, January 14, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Substitute Attorney
Fri 01/14 4:51 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Substitute Attorney, Catherine Schneider and Laura Andrade added attorney Scott Alan Brown,Scott Alan Brown for Anas Amin. Motion filed by Anas Amin Attorney Scott Alan Brown added to party Anas Amin(pty:pla) (Brown, Scott) |
|
Thursday, December 30, 2021 | ||
6 | 6
order
Order
Thu 12/30 5:31 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Catherine Schneider ("counsel"), whose name appears on a pleading in this case, is not a member of the Bar of the Northern District of Texas. Accordingly, within 15 days of the date of this order, counsel shall either (1) provide to the court, and to the clerk of court, satisfactory documentation of membership* or (2) apply for membership in the Bar of this court or for admission pro hac vice for this case. (*A letter stating the date of counsel's admission to the Bar of this court is satisfactory documentation.) (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 12/30/2021) (chmb) |
|
5 | 5
order
Order
Thu 12/30 5:29 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: Local Rule 83.10(a) requires the appearance of local counsel where counsel of record for a party does not reside in this district. Accordingly, no later than January 20, 2022, the defendants shall file the entry of appearance of local counsel satisfying the requirements of Local Rule 83.10(a). Failure to do so will subject the defendants to the entry of default judgment without further notice. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 12/30/2021) (chmb) |
|
4 | 4
order
Order
Thu 12/30 5:26 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: On December 30, 2021, the defendant United Financial Casualty Company removed this civil action to this court. Local Rule 81.2 provides that "[w]ithin 21 days after the notice of removal is filed, the plaintiff shall file a separately signed certificate of interested persons that complies with LR 3.1(c) or 3.2(e). If the plaintiff concurs in the accuracy of another party's previously-filed certificate, the plaintiff may adopt that certificate." LR 3.1(c) and 3.2(e) in turn require that when a complaint is filed, the plaintiff must provide the clerk with "a separately signed certificate of interested persons -- in a form approved by the clerk -- that contains -- in addition to the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a) -- a complete list of all persons, associations of persons, firms, partnerships, corporations, guarantors, insurers, affiliates, parent or subsidiary corporations, or other legal entities that are financially interested in the outcome of the case. If a large group of persons or firms can be specified by a generic description, individual listing is not necessary." Accordingly, no later than January 20, 2022, the plaintiff must comply with Rule 3.1(c) or 3.2(e) so that the court can ensure that recusal is not required in this case. (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 12/30/2021) (chmb) |
|
3 | 3
order
Order
Thu 12/30 5:24 PM
ELECTRONIC ORDER: On December 30, 2021, the defendant United Financial Casualty Company removed this civil action to this court. Local Rule 81.1 provides that "[t]he party or parties that remove a civil action from state court must provide the following to the clerk for filing: a completed civil cover sheet; a supplemental civil cover sheet;... and a notice of removal with a copy of each of the following attached to both the original and the judge's copy -- an index of all documents that clearly identifies each document and indicates the date the document was filed in state court; a copy of the docket sheet in the state court action; each document filed in the state court action, except discovery material (if filed on paper, each document must be individually tabbed and arranged in chronological order according to the state court file date; if filed by electronic means, each document must be filed as a separate attachment); and a separately signed certificate of interested persons that complies with LR 3.1(c) or 3.2(e)." Accordingly, no later than January 20, 2022, the defendant United Financial Casualty Company must comply with this rule, and the defendant Progressive County Mutual Insurance Company must file a separately signed certificate of interested persons that complies with LR 3.1(c) or 3.2(e). (Ordered by Senior Judge A. Joe Fish on 12/30/2021) (chmb) |
|
2 | 2
qcref
Fish
Thu 12/30 4:27 PM
New Case Notes: A filing fee has been paid. Pursuant to Misc. Order 6, Plaintiff is provided the Notice of Right to Consent to Proceed Before A U.S. Magistrate Judge (Judge Ramirez). Clerk to provide copy to plaintiff if not received electronically. (ndt) |
|
1 | 1
6
pgs
notice
Notice of Removal
Thu 12/30 4:05 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL WITH JURY DEMAND filed by United Financial Casualty Company. (Filing fee $402; receipt number 0539-12489436) In each Notice of Electronic Filing, the judge assignment is indicated, and a link to the[LINK:Judges Copy Requirements] and[LINK:Judge Specific Requirements] is provided. The court reminds the filer that any required copy of this and future documents must be delivered to the judge, in the manner prescribed, within three business days of filing. Unless exempted, attorneys who are not admitted to practice in the Northern District of Texas must seek admission promptly. Forms and Instructions found at www.txnd.uscourts.gov, or by clicking here:[LINK:Attorney Information - Bar Membership] . If admission requirements are not satisfied within 21 days, the clerk will notify the presiding judge. (Lapidus, Mark) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit(s), | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) |