Alexander v. City of Syracuse
Original Case: 5:17-cv-01195
Second Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals | |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-00103 |
Type | civil / private |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Jan 18, 2022 |
Last checked: Thursday Jan 20, 2022 3:23 AM EST |
Defendant
County of Onondaga
|
|
Defendant
Lashauna Monahan
|
|
Defendant - Appellee
City of Syracuse
|
Represented By
|
Defendant - Appellee
Detective Rory Gilhooley
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff - Appellant
Troy Alexander
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 01/20/2022 3:16 AM EST |
Tuesday, January 18, 2022 | ||
1 | 1 NOTICE OF CIVIL APPEAL, with district court docket, on behalf of Appellant Troy Alexander in 22-103, FILED. [3245735] [22-103, 21-3075 [Entered: 01/19/2022 12:34 PM] | |
Att: 1 2 pgs Dkt_Ntc_BK_CV_PR_Tax | ||
Att: 2 22 pgs Case FILED | ||
2 | 2 8 pgs DISTRICT COURT DECISION AND ORDER, dated 01/06/2022, RECEIVED.[3245816] [22-103] [Entered: 01/19/2022 12:54 PM] | |
3 | 3 1 pgs DISTRICT COURT JUDGMENT, dated 01/07/2022, RECEIVED.[3245876] [22-103] [Entered: 01/19/2022 01:07 PM] | |
5 | 5 NOTE: See lead case, 21-3075 containing complete set of docket entries.[3245916] [22-103] [Entered: 01/19/2022 01:19 PM] | |
7 | 7 ELECTRONIC INDEX, in lieu of record, FILED.[3245983] [22-103] [Entered: 01/19/2022 01:41 PM] | |
Att: 1 1 pgs Notice_of_Index_or_ROA_Filed | ||
Att: 2 23 pgs Index/FRAP 10(d) in lieu of ROA FILED |