Mackinac Island Ferry Capital LLC v. Haldimand Bay Company, LLC et al
Michigan Western District Court | |
Judge: | R Allan Edgar |
Case #: | 2:14-cv-00177 |
Nature of Suit | 120 Contract - Marine |
Cause | 12:1819 Default of Promissory Note |
Case Filed: | Aug 20, 2014 |
Terminated: | May 22, 2015 |
Last checked: Friday May 08, 2015 4:37 AM EDT |
cross-claimant
The Toots Foundation
|
Represented By
|
cross-claimant
The Henry W. Schneider Delaware Trust
|
Represented By
|
cross-claimant
The 2008 Henry W. Schneider Trust
|
Represented By
|
cross-claimant
Stephen Schneider Trust
|
Represented By
|
cross-claimant
Henry W. Schneider
|
Represented By
|
cross-claimant
Anita Schneider
|
Represented By
|
cross-defendant
Arnold Transit Company
|
|
cross-defendant
Union Terminal Piers, Inc.
|
|
cross-defendant
Island Management Company, LLC
|
|
cross-defendant
Straits Transit, Inc.
|
|
cross-defendant
Island Resource Company, LLC
|
|
cross-defendant
Northern Ferry Company, LLc
|
|
cross-defendant
McGregor Oil Company
|
|
defendant
Union Terminal Piers, Inc.
|
|
defendant
Straits Transit, Inc.
|
|
defendant
The Toots Foundation
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Straits of Mackinac II, Official No. 521407
|
|
defendant
Straits Express, Official No. 1029924
|
|
defendant
Henry W. Schneider
|
Represented By
|
defendant
The 2008 Henry W. Schneider Trust
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Union Savings Bank
|
Represented By
|
defendant
United States Department of Treasury - Internal Revenue Service
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Island Resource Company, LLC
|
|
defendant
Arnold Transit Company
|
|
defendant
Beaver, Official No. 264186
|
|
defendant
Chippewa, Official No. 288825
|
|
defendant
Corsair, Official No. 269660
|
|
defendant
Department of Treasury - Internal Revenue Service
|
|
defendant
The Henry W. Schneider Delaware Trust
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Huron, Official No. 269888
|
|
defendant
Island Express, Official No. 931459
|
|
defendant
Island Management Company, LLC
|
|
defendant
Algomah II, Official No. 286075
|
|
defendant
Mackinac Express, Official No. 915735
|
|
defendant
Mackinac Islander, Official No. 253170
|
|
defendant
McGregor Oil Company
|
|
defendant
Northern Ferry Company, LLc
|
|
defendant
Ottawa, Official No. 278860
|
|
defendant
Anita Schneider
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Henry W Schneider
|
|
defendant
Stephen Schneider Trust
|
Represented By
|
defendant
The 2008 Henry W Schneider Trust
|
|
plaintiff
Mackinac Island Ferry Capital LLC
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
cross-defendant
Haldimand Bay Company, LLC
Terminated: 05/01/2015
|
|
defendant
U.S. Bancorp
Terminated: 10/27/2014
|
|
defendant
Mackinac County Treasurer
Terminated: 05/01/2015
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Chase Industries, Inc.
Terminated: 04/29/2015
|
|
defendant
Cheboygan County Treasurer
Terminated: 05/01/2015
|
Represented By
|
defendant
Haldimand Bay Company, LLC
Terminated: 05/01/2015
|
|
defendant
Michigan Department of Treasury
Terminated: 05/01/2015
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, September 16, 2015 | ||
152 | 152
order
Order on Stipulation and Proposed Order
Wed 09/16 9:37 AM
ORDER granting STIPULATION151 ; signed by Judge R. Allan Edgar (Judge R. Allan Edgar, cam) |
|
Wednesday, September 09, 2015 | ||
151 | 151
motion
Stipulation and Order (Proposed-one document)
Wed 09/09 4:12 PM
PROPOSED STIPULATION and ORDER Amended by plaintiff Mackinac Island Ferry Capital LLC (Vermetten, Matthew) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B |