Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians et al v. Jaeger
North Dakota District Court | |
Judge: | Peter D Welte |
Referred: | Alice R Senechal |
Case #: | 3:22-cv-00022 |
Nature of Suit | 441 Civil Rights - Voting |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question: Other Civil Rights |
Case Filed: | Feb 07, 2022 |
Terminated: | Nov 17, 2023 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 06, 2022 4:38 AM CDT |
Amicus
United States of America
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alvin Jaeger
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Collette Brown
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Wesley Davis
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Zachery S. King
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Spirit Lake Tribe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Turtle Mountain Band of Chippewa Indians
|
Represented By
|
1. | Tribes in ND get a win in federal court (valleynewslive.com) |
Submitted Mon 07/11/2022 | |
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
appeal
USCA Case Number
Tue 01/30 11:56 AM
USCA Case Number 24-1171 for165 Notice of Appeal. Case has been consolidated with case number 23-3697 (sc) |
||
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
166 | 166
appeal
NOA Supplement
Fri 01/26 3:34 PM
Transmittal of Notice of Appeal Supplement to 8th Circuit Court of Appeals re165 Notice of Appeal (pb) |
|
165 | 165
appeal
Notice of Appeal
Fri 01/26 2:04 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to164 Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File, Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, Order on Motion to Expedite by North Dakota Legislative Assembly. Filing fee $605. (Porsborg, Scott) |