Africa International Mining Procurement, CC v. Fuel Reformation, Inc. et al
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Raag Singhal |
Case #: | 0:22-cv-60310 |
Nature of Suit | 190 Contract - Other Contract |
Cause | 28:1330 Breach of Contract |
Case Filed: | Feb 09, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jan 17, 2023 |
Last checked: Monday Aug 08, 2022 4:22 AM EDT |
Defendant
Phillip G. Brown
an individual 619 N. Andrews Avenue, #413
Fort Lauderdale, FL 33311 |
|
Defendant
Fuel Reformation, Inc.
a Delaware Corporation c/o Phillip George Brown, Reg. Agent 3550 N.W. 112 Street
Miami, FL 33167 |
|
Defendant
Rohan Mowatt
an individual 3550 N.W. 112 Street
Miami, FL 33167 |
|
Plaintiff
Africa International Mining Procurement, CC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 17, 2023 | ||
37 | 37
order
Judgment - Default
Wed 01/18 11:53 AM
DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT in favor of Africa International Mining Procurement, CC against Fuel Reformation, Inc., Phillip G. Brown, Rohan Mowatt Closing Case. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/17/2023. See attached document for full details. (pc) |
|
36 | 36
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Wed 01/18 11:45 AM
ORDER ON NOTICE OF JOINT LIABILITY: re26 Notice (Other) filed by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 1/17/2023. See attached document for full details. (pc) |
|
Thursday, January 12, 2023 | ||
35 | 35
notice
Notice (Other)
Thu 01/12 2:57 PM
NOTICE by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC re26 Notice (Other), 29 Order on Motion for Extension of Time, 27 Order,, 33 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney,30 Notice (Other), OF FILING (Carlin, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order | ||
34 | 34
notice
Notice of Striking
Thu 01/12 2:38 PM
NOTICE of Striking31 Notice (Other) filed by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC,30 Notice (Other), filed by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC (Carlin, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, January 11, 2023 | ||
32 | 32
misc
Affidavit
Wed 01/11 10:00 AM
AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS signed by: Justin C. Carlin by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC (Carlin, Justin) |
|
notice
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Wed 01/11 4:14 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re30 Notice (Other),31 Notice (Other),. Proposed Orders Docketed as Main Documents ; CORRECTIVE ACTION REQUIRED - Filer must File a Notice of Striking, then resubmit the proposed orders as instructed in the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures. (pes) |
||
Tuesday, January 10, 2023 | ||
31 | 31
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/10 6:24 PM
NOTICE by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC re 27 Order,,26 Notice (Other),30 Notice (Other), 29 Order on Motion for Extension of Time of Filing Proposed Default Final Judgment (Carlin, Justin) |
|
30 | 30
notice
Notice (Other)
Tue 01/10 6:23 PM
NOTICE by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC re 27 Order,,26 Notice (Other), 29 Order on Motion for Extension of Time of Filing Proposed order on Notice of Joint Liability, Including Findings of Fact (Carlin, Justin) |
|
Tuesday, December 20, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Tue 12/20 12:07 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting28 Motion for Extension of Time. Deadline to submit Proposed Final Order and Proposed Final Judgment extended to 1/10/2023. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/20/2022. (pls) |
||
Monday, December 19, 2022 | ||
28 | 28
motion
Extension of Time
Mon 12/19 10:20 PM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Submit Proposed Final Order and Final Judgment re 27 Order,,26 Notice (Other),25 Order by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC. Responses due by 1/3/2023 (Carlin, Justin) |
|
Monday, December 12, 2022 | ||
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Mon 12/12 2:53 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER re26 Notice (Other) filed by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC. Plaintiff has filed a26 Notice of Joint Liability but has failed to file and email to Chambers (singhal@flsd.uscourts.gov) a proposed order and a proposed final judgment. Plaintiff shall file and email the proposed order supported by factual findings and proposed final judgment no later than December 19, 2022. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 12/12/2022. (pls) |
||
Wednesday, October 19, 2022 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice (Other)
Wed 10/19 5:42 PM
NOTICE by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC re25 Order (Carlin, Justin) |
|
Wednesday, October 05, 2022 | ||
25 | 25
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Wed 10/05 2:36 PM
Order on Default Final Judgment Procedure: re24 Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/5/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc) |
|
Tuesday, October 04, 2022 | ||
24 | 24
order
Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM
Tue 10/04 2:13 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Fuel Reformation, Inc., Philip G. Brown, Rohan Mowatt - Motions Terminated:23 Motion for Clerk's Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 10/4/2022. (amb) |
|
23 | 23
motion
Clerk's Entry of Default
Tue 10/04 10:50 AM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Phillip G. Brown, Fuel Reformation, Inc., Rohan Mowatt by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC. (Carlin, Justin) |
|
Monday, October 03, 2022 | ||
22 | 22
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Mon 10/03 2:57 PM
Order on Default Procedure. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 10/3/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc) |
|
Tuesday, September 27, 2022 | ||
21 | 21
misc
Affidavit
Tue 09/27 11:43 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Florida Secretary of State's Notice of Acceptance of Service of Process (Phillip G. Brown) signed by: Justin C. Carlin re18 Affidavit,, by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC(Carlin, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Return Receipt for Mailing | ||
20 | 20
misc
Affidavit
Tue 09/27 11:41 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Florida Secretary of State's Notice of Acceptance of Service of Process (Fuel Reformation, Inc.) signed by: Justin C. Carlin re17 Affidavit,, by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC(Carlin, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Return Receipt for Mailing | ||
Tuesday, August 30, 2022 | ||
19 | 19
misc
Affidavit
Tue 08/30 1:58 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Process (Rowan Mowatt) signed by: Justin C. Carlin re12 Summons Issued,16 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,15 Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time,13 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint MOTION for Extension of Time to Effect Service of Process by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC(Carlin, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Acceptance of Service of Process (Secretary of State), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Service of Process, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Return Receipt | ||
18 | 18
misc
Affidavit
Tue 08/30 1:57 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Process (Phillip G. Brown) signed by: Justin C. Carlin re12 Summons Issued,16 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,15 Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time,13 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint MOTION for Extension of Time to Effect Service of Process by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC(Carlin, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Acceptance of Service of Process (Secretary of State), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Service of Process, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Return Receipt | ||
17 | 17
misc
Affidavit
Tue 08/30 1:52 PM
AFFIDAVIT of Service of Process (Fuel Reformation, Inc.) signed by: Justin C. Carlin re12 Summons Issued,16 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal,15 Order on Motion for Leave to File,, Order on Motion for Extension of Time,13 Motion for Leave to File Second Amended Complaint MOTION for Extension of Time to Effect Service of Process by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC(Carlin, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Notice of Acceptance of Service of Process (Secretary of State), | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Notice of Service of Process, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Return Receipt | ||
16 | 16
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Tue 08/30 10:44 AM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT against Africa International Mining Procurement, CC filed in response to Order Granting Motion for Leave, filed by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC.(Carlin, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Purchase Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Promissory Note, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Legal Assistant's Note, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Emails to Michael Whitticar, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Returns of Non-Service, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit F - Emails to Defendants | ||
Monday, July 25, 2022 | ||
15 | 15
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Leave to File Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Mon 07/25 2:37 PM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT AND FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO EFFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS: In re DE13 Motion for Leave to File. Clerks Notice: Filer must separately re-file the amended pleading pursuant to Local Rule 15.1, unless otherwise ordered by the Judge ; granting13 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 7/25/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc) |
|
Wednesday, July 20, 2022 | ||
notice
Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney
Wed 07/20 10:52 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re13 First MOTION to Amend/Correct Amended Complaint . Motion with Multiple Reliefs Filed as One Relief ; ERROR - The Filer selected only one relief event and failed to select the additional corresponding events for each relief requested in the motion. The docket entry was corrected by the Clerk. It is not necessary to refile this document but future filings must comply with the instructions in the CM/ECF Attorney User's Manual. (ls) |
||
Tuesday, July 19, 2022 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Amend/Correct
Tue 07/19 9:16 PM
First MOTION to Amend/Correct Amended Complaint by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC. Responses due by 8/2/2022(Carlin, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Emails, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Proposed 2d Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex A to Proposed 2d Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex B to Proposed 2d Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex C to Proposed 2d Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex D to Proposed 2d Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex E to Proposed 2d Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex F to Proposed 2d Amended Complaint, | ||
Att: 9 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Friday, July 15, 2022 | ||
12 | 12
service
Summons Issued
Fri 07/15 3:45 PM
Summons Issued as to Phillip G. Brown, Fuel Reformation, Inc., Rohan Mowatt. (pes) |
|
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Fri 07/15 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC re8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, filed by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC (Carlin, Justin) |
|
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Fri 07/15 10:35 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC re9 Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es) filed by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC (Carlin, Justin) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Filing Proposed Summons(es)
Fri 07/15 10:34 AM
NOTICE of Filing Proposed Summons(es) by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC re8 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal, filed by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC (Carlin, Justin) |
|
8 | 8
cmp
Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal
Fri 07/15 12:17 AM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Africa International Mining Procurement, CC, filed by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC.(Carlin, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Purchase Agreement, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Promissory Note, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Legal Assistant's Note, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit E-mails to Wihtticar, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Returns of Non-Service, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit E-mails to Defendants | ||
Friday, May 20, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Fri 05/20 4:18 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Raag Singhal on 5/20/2022. See attached document for full details. (pc) |
|
Thursday, May 19, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
motion
Extension of Time
Thu 05/19 11:22 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Effect Service of Process re3 Summons Issued,5 Summons Issued,4 Summons Issued by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC. Responses due by 6/2/2022(Carlin, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order | ||
Thursday, February 10, 2022 | ||
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Thu 02/10 9:17 AM
Summons Issued as to Phillip G. Brown. (mab) |
|
Wednesday, February 09, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued
Thu 02/10 9:18 AM
Summons Issued as to Rohan Mowatt. (mab) |
|
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued
Thu 02/10 9:16 AM
Summons Issued as to Fuel Reformation, Inc.. (mab) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 02/09 6:01 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants. Filing fees $ 402.00 receipt number AFLSDC-15388192, filed by Africa International Mining Procurement, CC, d/b/a Africa International, a foreign corporation.(Carlin, Justin) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Exhibit B, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Exhibit C, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Exhibit D, | ||
Att: 6 Summon(s) Summons for Fuel Restoration, | ||
Att: 7 Summon(s) Summons for Brown, | ||
Att: 8 Summon(s) Summons for Mowatt | ||
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 02/10 8:56 AM
Clerks Notice Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (mab) |