Harris et al v. Startek USA, Inc.
Colorado District Court | |
Judge: | Raymond P Moore |
Referred: | James P O'Hara |
Case #: | 1:22-cv-00437 |
Nature of Suit | 710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act |
Cause | 29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act |
Case Filed: | Feb 18, 2022 |
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 17, 2022 3:06 AM MDT |
Defendant
Startek USA, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Makayla Harris
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Colleen Lewin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tiffany Williams
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/22/2024 11:59 PM MDT |
Wednesday, April 17, 2024 | ||
72 | 72
order
Order on Motion to Amend/Correct/Modify
Wed 04/17 1:55 PM
ORDER: This matter is before the Court on Plaintiffs' Second Motion to Modify Notice,71 , which requests that the Court incorporate additional modifications to the Notice Plaintiffs may issue. Although Defendant has not stated a position on this Motion, having considered Plaintiffs' Motion, the record, and caselaw, and being otherwise fully advised, the Court finds no response is required before ruling. See D.C.COLO.LCivR 7.1(d). The Motion is GRANTED Plaintiffs' modified notice [71-1] is APPROVED. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/17/2024. (Text Only Entry)(rmsec) |
|
71 | 71
motion
Amend/Correct/Modify
Wed 04/17 8:24 AM
Second MOTION to Amend/Correct/Modify Notice by Plaintiffs Makayla Harris, Colleen Lewin, Tiffany Williams.(Stoops, Kevin) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Amended Notice, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order (PDF Only) | ||
Wednesday, April 10, 2024 | ||
70 | 70
14
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Order Order on Motion to Expedite
Wed 04/10 1:35 PM
ORDER granting55 Plaintiff's Motion for Equitable Tolling; denying as moot68 Parties' Joint Motion for Expedited Consideration of Plaintiffs Motion for Equitable Tolling. SO ORDERED by Judge Raymond P. Moore on 4/10/2024.(dgumb, ) |