Paxton et al v. Richardson
Texas Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Mark Pittman |
Case #: | 4:22-cv-00143 |
Nature of Suit | 440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights |
Cause | 28:1361 Petition for Writ of Mandamus |
Case Filed: | Feb 24, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jul 18, 2023 |
Last checked: Tuesday Aug 23, 2022 4:10 AM CDT |
Defendant
Merrick B Garland
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gary M. Restaino
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Floice Allen
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Tracy Martin
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Ken Paxton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
David Schnitz
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
Marvin Richardson
Terminated: 05/17/2022
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, September 22, 2023 | ||
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 09/22 5:03 PM
APPEARANCE FORM FILED at USCA5 by Attorney(s) Abby Christine Wright for party(s) Appellee Merrick Garland, U.S. Attorney General Appellee Steven Dettelbach, in case 23-10802 Access to the EROA has been granted. (tle) |
||
Thursday, September 21, 2023 | ||
appeal
Appeal Record Certified/Transmitted
Thu 09/21 10:47 AM
Record on Appeal for USCA5 23-10802 : Record consisting of: 1 ECF electronic record on appeal (eROA) is certified,. PLEASE NOTE THE FOLLOWING: Licensed attorneys must have filed an appearance in the USCA5 case and be registered for electronic filing in the USCA5 to access the paginated eROA in the USCA5 ECF system. (Take these steps immediately if you have not already done so. Once you have filed the notice of appearance and/or USCA5 ECF registration, it may take up to 3 business days for the circuit to notify the district clerk that we may grant you access to the eROA in the USCA5 ECF system.) To access the paginated record, log in to the USCA5 ECF system, and under the Utilities menu, select Electronic Record on Appeal. Pro se litigants may request a copy of the record by[LINK:contacting the appeals deputy] in advance to arrange delivery. (tle) |