Larbi v. Blinken et al
Texas Western District Court | |
Judge: | Alan D Albright |
Referred: | Jeffrey C Manske |
Case #: | 6:22-cv-00198 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 08:1329 Writ of Mandamus to Adjudicate Visa Petiti |
Case Filed: | Feb 25, 2022 |
Terminated: | Jun 24, 2022 |
Last checked: Saturday Aug 27, 2022 5:27 AM CDT |
Petitioner
Andrews HK Larbi
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Antony Blinken
|
Represented By
|
Respondent
Merrick Garland
|
|
Respondent
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
|
|
Respondent
Alejandro Mayorkas
|
|
Respondent
Heather Variava
|
|
Respondent
Richard C. Visek
|
|
Respondent
Christopher Wray
|
Docket last updated: 04/18/2024 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, June 24, 2022 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 06/24 7:05 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Andrews HK Larbi (Goldstein, Joshua) |
|
Monday, May 16, 2022 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Mon 05/16 9:10 AM
Text Order GRANTING7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply entered by Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. Defendants' deadline to answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint is extended to August 2, 2022. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (eglc) |
||
Friday, May 13, 2022 | ||
7 | 7
motion
Extension of Time to File Response/Reply
Fri 05/13 10:40 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Defendants' Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time by Antony Blinken, Merrick Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Heather Variava, Richard C. Visek, Christopher Wray.. Motions referred to Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. (McAndrew, Lacy) |
|
Att: 1 Proposed Order | ||
utility
Set/Reset Answer Deadline
Fri 05/13 11:20 AM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Antony Blinken answer due 8/2/2022; Merrick Garland answer due 8/2/2022; Ur Mendoza Jaddou answer due 8/2/2022; Alejandro Mayorkas answer due 8/2/2022; Heather Variava answer due 8/2/2022; Richard C. Visek answer due 8/2/2022; Christopher Wray answer due 8/2/2022. (sm3) |
||
Friday, April 08, 2022 | ||
6 | 6
service
Summons Returned Executed as to USA
Fri 04/08 11:47 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Andrews HK Larbi. Antony Blinken served on 3/15/2022, answer due 5/16/2022; Merrick Garland served on 3/15/2022, answer due 5/16/2022; Ur Mendoza Jaddou served on 3/14/2022, answer due 5/13/2022; Alejandro Mayorkas served on 3/14/2022, answer due 5/13/2022; Heather Variava served on 3/15/2022, answer due 5/16/2022; Richard C. Visek served on 3/15/2022, answer due 5/16/2022; Christopher Wray served on 3/15/2022, answer due 5/16/2022. (Goldstein, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, March 29, 2022 | ||
5 | 5
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Tue 03/29 3:07 PM
Summons Issued as to U.S. Attorney's Civil Process Clerk (lad) |
|
4 | 4
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Tue 03/29 1:41 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Andrews HK Larbi. (Goldstein, Joshua) |
|
Thursday, March 10, 2022 | ||
misc
Remark (No Doc#)
Thu 03/10 5:09 PM
Parties shall comply with Judge Albright's updated[LINK:standing orders] and[LINK:COVID-19 standing order] available by clicking the included hyperlinks. The updated orders are as follows: 1. [LINK:Standing Order Regarding Notice of Readiness for Patent Cases 030722] , 2. [LINK:Standing Order on Pretrial Procedures and Requirements in Civil Cases 030722] , 3. [LINK:Standing Order Governing Proceedings 4.0 - Patent Cases 030722] , 4. [LINK:Amended Standing Order Regarding Coronavirus (COVID-19) and Court Proceedings] , 5. [LINK:Amended Standing Order Regarding Joint Or Unopposed Request To Change Deadlines 030722] , 6. [LINK:Amended Standing Order Regarding Filing Documents Under Seal and Redacted Public Versions 030722] . (jkda) |
||
Monday, February 28, 2022 | ||
3 | 3
service
Summons Issued as to USA
Mon 02/28 11:00 AM
Summons Issued as to Antony Blinken, Merrick Garland, Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Alejandro Mayorkas, Heather Variava, Richard C. Visek, Christopher Wray, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (lad) |
|
misc
Remark (No Doc#)
Mon 02/28 10:46 AM
All parties shall comply with the Standing Orders located at https://www.txwd.uscourts.gov/judges-information/standing-orders/. (lad) |
||
Friday, February 25, 2022 | ||
2 | 2
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Fri 02/25 6:34 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Andrews HK Larbi. (Goldstein, Joshua) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Fri 02/25 6:29 PM
COMPLAINT for Injunctive Relief and Petition for Writ of Mandamus ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0542-15757175), filed by Andrews HK Larbi.(Goldstein, Joshua) |
|
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned Case Referred to Magistrate Judge
Mon 02/28 11:03 AM
Case assigned to Judge Alan D Albright and REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Jeffrey C. Manske. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE (lad) |