California Central District Court
Judge:Christina A Snyder
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:22-cv-02009
Nature of Suit820 Property Rights - Copyrights
Cause17:501 Copyright Infringement
Case Filed:Mar 25, 2022
Terminated:Dec 11, 2023
Last checked: Wednesday Sep 21, 2022 2:01 AM PDT
Defendant
Tencent Cloud LLC
Represented By
Alyssa Crooke
Fenwick And West LLP
contact info
Garner F Kropp
Fenwick And West LLP
contact info
Eric J Ball
Fenwick And West LLP
contact info
Katherine Anne Marshall
Fenwick And West LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Snail Games USA Inc.
Represented By
Edgar Taylor Morris, IV
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Michael Francis LaFond
Quinn Emanuel. Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Moon Hee Lee
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Robert M. Schwartz
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Robert M Schwartz
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info
Daniel C Posner
Quinn Emanuel Urquhart And Sullivan LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Monday, December 18, 2023
51 51 misc Report of Determination of Copyright Action (CLOSE) (AO 121) Mon 12/18 11:56 AM
REPORT ON THE DETERMINATION OF AN ACTION Regarding a Copyright. (Closing) (gk)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Order to Dismiss All Claims
Monday, December 11, 2023
50 50 order Dismissing Case Sun 12/17 6:36 PM
ORDER TO DISMISS CLAIMS WITH PREJUDICE by Judge Christina A. Snyder,49 : IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that that all claims filed by the Parties in the instant litigation are hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. SO ORDERED.. Case Terminated. Made JS-6. (shb)
Related: [-]