Joshua Hardt et al v. Chrysler Group LLC
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | S James Otero |
Referred: | Charles F Eick |
Case #: | 8:14-cv-01375 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Aug 27, 2014 |
Terminated: | Dec 18, 2015 |
Last checked: Sunday May 10, 2015 7:21 AM PDT |
Defendant
Chrysler Group LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Joshua Hardt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Marta Hardt
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Molly Gonzalez
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Friday, December 18, 2015 | ||
53 | 53
order
Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Terminate Civil Case
Fri 12/18 4:50 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge S. James Otero: The Court is in receipt of the NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Molly Gonzalez,Joshua Hardt, Marta Hardt, Noel Price filed on 12/17/201552 . Dismissal is With Prejudice.Accordingly, the Court Orders this matter dismissed pursuant to NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) |
|
Thursday, December 17, 2015 | ||
52 | 52
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Thu 12/17 10:21 AM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiffs Molly Gonzalez, Joshua Hardt, Marta Hardt, Noel Price. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Lurie, Jordan) |